EP1243080 - SLIDING MATCHED FILTER WITH FLEXIBLE HARDWARE COMPLEXITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2003 [2003/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Golden Bridge Technology, Inc. Suite 190, 185 Route 36 West Long Branch, NJ 07764 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states Golden Bridge Technology, Inc. Suite 190, 185 Route 36 West Long Branch, NJ 07764 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Gang 18 Victoria Drive Eatontown, NJ 07724 / US | 02 /
LI, Don 70 Waterford Avenue Morganville, NJ 07751 / US | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2002/40] |
Former [2002/39] | Bramer-Weger, Elmar, et al Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP, Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00990938.3 | 15.12.2000 | [2002/39] | WO2000US33902 | Priority number, date | US19990172150P | 17.12.1999 Original published format: US 172150 P | US20000185370P | 28.02.2000 Original published format: US 185370 P | US20000668743 | 25.09.2000 Original published format: US 668743 | [2002/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0145290 | Date: | 21.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1243080 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
H04B1/70751 (EP,US);
H04B1/7093 (EP,US);
H04B1/7095 (EP,US);
H04B1/70752 (EP,US);
H04B1/70775 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/39] | Title | German: | GLEITENDES ANGEPASSTES FILTER MIT FLEXIBELER HARDWAREKOMPLEXITÄT | [2002/39] | English: | SLIDING MATCHED FILTER WITH FLEXIBLE HARDWARE COMPLEXITY | [2002/39] | French: | FILTRE ADAPTE COMBINE A UN INTEGRATEUR PRESENTANT UNE COMPLEXITE MATERIELLE SOUPLE | [2002/39] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/04] | 26.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2003/04] | 31.12.2099 | Examination requested [2002/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]US6038250 (SHOU GUOLIANG [JP], et al); | [X]US5917829 (HERTZ DAVID [IL], et al); | [X]US4933952 (ALBRIEUX VINCENT [FR], et al); | [A]US5729571 (PARK JONG-HYEON [KR], et al); | [A]US5022046 (MORROW JR ROBERT K [US]) |