EP1244419 - AGENT FOR DYEING KERATIN CONTAINING FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2005/45] |
Former [2002/40] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf-Holthausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROSE, David Am Eichelkamp 223 40723 Hilden / DE | 02 /
HÖFFKES, Horst Carlo-Schmid-Strasse 113 40595 Düsseldorf / DE | 03 /
MEINIGKE, Bernd Wuppertalstrasse 84b 51381 Leverkusen / DE | [2002/40] | Application number, filing date | 00991207.2 | 18.12.2000 | [2002/40] | WO2000EP12893 | Priority number, date | DE1999162873 | 24.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19962873 | DE2000161990 | 13.12.2000 Original published format: DE 10061990 | [2002/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0147477 | Date: | 05.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1244419 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1244419 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/13 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
A61K8/4946 (EP,US);
A61K8/49 (EP,US);
A61Q5/065 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/40] | A61K7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/40] | Title | German: | MITTEL ZUM FÄRBEN VON KERATINHALTIGEN FASERN | [2002/40] | English: | AGENT FOR DYEING KERATIN CONTAINING FIBERS | [2002/40] | French: | AGENT POUR COLORER DES FIBRES KERATINIQUES | [2002/40] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.06.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/40] | 10.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 09.11.2005 | IE | 09.11.2005 | IT | 09.11.2005 | NL | 09.11.2005 | TR | 09.11.2005 | AT | 18.12.2005 | CY | 18.12.2005 | BE | 31.12.2005 | CH | 31.12.2005 | LI | 31.12.2005 | MC | 31.12.2005 | LU | 09.01.2006 | DK | 09.02.2006 | GR | 09.02.2006 | SE | 09.02.2006 | ES | 20.02.2006 | PT | 10.04.2006 | [2007/35] |
Former [2007/28] | FI | 09.11.2005 | |
IE | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
TR | 09.11.2005 | ||
AT | 18.12.2005 | ||
CY | 18.12.2005 | ||
BE | 31.12.2005 | ||
CH | 31.12.2005 | ||
LI | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 09.01.2006 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 09.11.2005 | |
IE | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
TR | 09.11.2005 | ||
CY | 18.12.2005 | ||
BE | 31.12.2005 | ||
CH | 31.12.2005 | ||
LI | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 09.01.2006 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | FI | 09.11.2005 | |
IE | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
TR | 09.11.2005 | ||
BE | 31.12.2005 | ||
CH | 31.12.2005 | ||
LI | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 09.01.2006 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 09.11.2005 | |
IE | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
TR | 09.11.2005 | ||
CH | 31.12.2005 | ||
LI | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
LU | 09.01.2006 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | FI | 09.11.2005 | |
IE | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
TR | 09.11.2005 | ||
CH | 31.12.2005 | ||
LI | 31.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 09.11.2005 | |
IE | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
TR | 09.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 09.11.2005 | |
IE | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 09.11.2005 | |
IE | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
MC | 31.12.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | FI | 09.11.2005 | |
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | FI | 09.11.2005 | |
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 09.11.2005 | |
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 09.11.2005 | |
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
SE | 09.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 09.11.2005 | |
NL | 09.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3749714 (SATO A, et al) [X] 1-4,8 * example - *; | [X]GB1412149 (ILFORD LTD) [X] 1-4,8 * example - *; | [X]EP0013257 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1-4,8,9 * example 1 *; | JPH01237452 [ ] (SANPO KAGAKU KENKYUSHO KK); | [A]EP0873746 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19732016 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1989-319875, XP002169922 [X] 1-4,8 * abstract * | Examination | EP1166753 |