EP1225873 - AMPHIPHILIC POLYMERIC VESICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BioCure, Inc. 2975 Gateway Drive, Suite 100 Norcross, Georgia 30071 / US | [2002/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEIER, Wolfgang Jakobsbergerholzweg 4 CH-4053 Basel / CH | 02 /
HIRT, Thomas Rohnackherstrasse 32 CH-9445 Rebstein / CH | 03 /
VEBERT-NARDIN, Corinne 18 A, rue de la Tuilerie F-68390 Sausheim / FR | [2002/42] |
Former [2002/31] | 01 /
MEIER, Wolfgang Jakobsbergerholzweg 4 CH-4053 Basel / CH | ||
02 /
HIRT, Thomas Rohnackherstrasse 32 CH-9445 Rebstein / CH | |||
03 /
NARDIN, Corinne 2, residence Charles Kroepfle F-68300 St. Louis / FR | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00991449.0 | 02.11.2000 | [2002/31] | WO2000US41791 | Priority number, date | US19990163678P | 05.11.1999 Original published format: US 163678 P | US20000615305 | 13.07.2000 Original published format: US 615305 | [2002/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0132146 | Date: | 10.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1225873 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1225873 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127, A61K9/51 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
A61K9/5146 (EP,US);
A61K9/5192 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AMPHIPHILE POLYMERE VESIKEL | [2002/31] | English: | AMPHIPHILIC POLYMERIC VESICLES | [2002/31] | French: | VESICULES POLYMERES AMPHIPHILES | [2002/31] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.05.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 16.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.2006 | BE | 15.03.2006 | CY | 15.03.2006 | FI | 15.03.2006 | IT | 15.03.2006 | NL | 15.03.2006 | TR | 15.03.2006 | DK | 15.06.2006 | SE | 15.06.2006 | GR | 16.06.2006 | ES | 26.06.2006 | PT | 16.08.2006 | IE | 02.11.2006 | LU | 02.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
IT | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
TR | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
GR | 16.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.11.2006 | ||
LU | 02.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
IT | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
GR | 16.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
IT | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
IE | 02.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
IT | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
IT | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
BE | 15.03.2006 | ||
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 15.03.2006 | |
FI | 15.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 15.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH10110019 ; | [X]EP0552802 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1,3-11,15,18-23,25 * claims 1-12 *; | [DX]WO9749387 (SEARLE & CO [US]) [DX] 1-3,5-7,9-11,15,18-21,23,24 * page 4, line 23 - page 5, line 27 * * page 12, line 5 - page 15, line 34 * * page 69, line 1 - page 73, line 7 * * page 82, line 30 - page 83, line 38 * * claims 1-37 *; | [A]WO9912059 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] * page 25 - page 26; examples 1-3 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, & JP10110019 A 19980428 (KATAOKA KAZUNORI) [X] 1,3,4,6-8,10,15,19-22,25 * abstract * | [X] - A.V. KABANOV ET AL., "a new class of drug carriers: micelles of poly (oxyethylene)-poly (oxypropylene) block copolymers as microcontainers for drug targeting from blood in brain", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, Amsterdam (NL), (199210), vol. 22, no. 2, pages 141 - 157, XP000291644 [X] 1,27,28 * page 141 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-3659(92)90199-2 | Examination | - DISCHER B.M. ET AL, "Polymersomes: tough vesicles made from diblock copolymers", SCIENCE, (19990514), vol. 284, pages 1143 - 1146 |