EP1239910 - EXPIRATION-DEPENDENT GAS DOSAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INO Therapeutics GmbH Erdbergstrasse 197-199 1111 Vienna / AT | [2003/10] |
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states Messer Austria GmbH Am Kanal 2 2352 Gumpoldskirchen / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUELLNER, Rainer Friedhofstrasse 13a A-2351 Wiener Neudorf / AT | [2002/38] | Representative(s) | Kasseckert, Rainer Linde Aktiengesellschaft Patent und Marken Dr.-Carl-von-Lindestrasse 6-14 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Kasseckert, Rainer Linde Aktiengesellschaft Patent und Marken Dr.-Carl-von-Lindestrasse 6-14 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | ||
Former [2003/14] | Kasseckert, Rainer Linde AG Zentrale Patentabteilung Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Strasse 6-14 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | ||
Former [2002/38] | Jäger, Gerhard Fred Messer Griesheim GmbH Patent-, Lizenz- und Markenabteilung 60270 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 00991584.4 | 06.12.2000 | [2002/38] | WO2000EP12244 | Priority number, date | DE1999160404 | 15.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19960404 | [2002/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0143805 | Date: | 21.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1239910 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1239910 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/12 | [2002/38] | CPC: |
A61M16/12 (EP,US);
A61M16/202 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0021 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0039 (EP,US);
A61M2202/0275 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/38] | Title | German: | EXSPIRATIONSABHÄNGIGE GASDOSIERUNG | [2002/38] | English: | EXPIRATION-DEPENDENT GAS DOSAGE | [2002/38] | French: | DOSAGE DE GAZ EN FONCTION DE L'EXPIRATION | [2002/38] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 28.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.03.2006 | FI | 01.03.2006 | FR | 01.03.2006 | GB | 01.03.2006 | IE | 01.03.2006 | IT | 01.03.2006 | NL | 01.03.2006 | TR | 01.03.2006 | DK | 01.06.2006 | SE | 01.06.2006 | GR | 02.06.2006 | ES | 12.06.2006 | PT | 01.08.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/38] | FI | 01.03.2006 | |
GB | 01.03.2006 | ||
IE | 01.03.2006 | ||
IT | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
TR | 01.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
GR | 02.06.2006 | ||
ES | 12.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 01.03.2006 | |
GB | 01.03.2006 | ||
IE | 01.03.2006 | ||
IT | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
GR | 02.06.2006 | ||
ES | 12.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | FI | 01.03.2006 | |
GB | 01.03.2006 | ||
IE | 01.03.2006 | ||
IT | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
ES | 12.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 01.03.2006 | |
GB | 01.03.2006 | ||
IE | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
ES | 12.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | FI | 01.03.2006 | |
GB | 01.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
ES | 12.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 01.03.2006 | |
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
DK | 01.06.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
ES | 12.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | FI | 01.03.2006 | |
NL | 01.03.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 01.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5615669 (OLSSON SVEN-GUNNAR [SE], et al); | [Y]WO9728838 (UNIV NEW YORK [US]) [Y] 4-6 * page 11, line 26 - page 12, line 14; figure 9 * * page 14, line 16 - page 15, line 24 * * page 19, line 3 - page 22, line 21; figures 13-15 *; | [XY]EP0806216 (SIEMENS ELEMA AB [SE]) [X] 1-3,7-12 * column 7, line 2 - line 39; figure 5 * [Y] 4-6,13; | [YD]WO9831282 (MESSER GRIESHEIM AUSTRIA GES M [AT], et al) [YD] 13 * page 15, line 3 - page 19, line 10; figure - * | by applicant | WO9831282 |