EP1239793 - SLING WITH PAD TREATMENT OF URINARY INCONTINENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Promedon S.A. Av. Circunvalacion 3085 Villa Aspasia 5010 Cordoba / AR | [2003/33] |
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states Promedon 30 bis, rue du Vieil Abreuvoir 78100 St. Germain en Laye / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FIERRO, Eduardo Felix Omledo No. 2230 5000 Cordoba / AR | [2002/38] | Representative(s) | Dossmann, Gérard Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71-73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | Dossmann, Gérard Bureau D.A. Casalonga-Josse Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/38] | Kremer, Robert A.M. BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00991794.9 | 20.12.2000 | [2002/38] | WO2000EP13016 | Priority number, date | FR19990016280 | 22.12.1999 Original published format: FR 9916280 | [2002/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0145589 | Date: | 28.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1239793 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1239793 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00 | [2002/38] | CPC: |
A61F2/0045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLINGE MIT POLSTERUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HARNINKONTINENZ | [2002/38] | English: | SLING WITH PAD TREATMENT OF URINARY INCONTINENCE | [2002/38] | French: | FRONDE A COUSSINET UTILISEE DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE L'INCONTINENCE URINAIRE | [2002/38] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 07.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.03.2005 | BE | 02.03.2005 | CH | 02.03.2005 | FI | 02.03.2005 | LI | 02.03.2005 | NL | 02.03.2005 | DK | 02.06.2005 | GR | 02.06.2005 | SE | 02.06.2005 | ES | 13.06.2005 | PT | 17.08.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
CH | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
LI | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
ES | 13.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
CH | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
LI | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
ES | 13.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 02.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4019499 (FITZGERALD MARTIN BRUCE) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 36; figure - *; | [A]US4786276 (HABER TERRY M [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 39 - line 58 * * figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0650703 (ROBERT ANTOINE JEAN HENRI [BR], et al) [A] 1 * page W *; | [AD]US5934283 (WILLEM GERMAIN E [BE], et al) [AD] 1 * column 5, line 1 - line 19 * * figures 2,3 *; | [XPA]WO0074633 (ETHICON INC [US]) [XP] 1-3,8,11 * page 8, line 21 - line 29 * * page 9, line 11 - line 16 * * page 9, line 20 - line 24 * * figures 2B-2D,4A-4F,7A-7H *[AP] 9 | by applicant | US5611515 | WO9835632 | US5934283 |