EP1217925 - ESPRESSO MACHINE WITH AN INFUSION PISTON DISPLACEABLE IN AN INFUSION CYLINDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.01.2005 [2005/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eugster/Frismag AG Im Hof 20 8590 Romanshorn / CH | [2002/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EUGSTER, Arthur Amriswilerstr. 89 CH-8590 Romanshorn / CH | [2002/27] | Representative(s) | Schubert, Siegmar Patentanwälte Dannenberg Schubert Gudel Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 60313 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | Schubert, Siegmar, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dannenberg Schubert Gudel Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 60313 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 00992191.7 | 05.10.2000 | [2002/27] | WO2000EP09724 | Priority number, date | DE1999217586U | 06.10.1999 Original published format: DE 29917586 U | [2002/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0124670 | Date: | 12.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1217925 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1217925 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/40 | [2002/27] | CPC: |
A47J31/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL [2004/06] |
Former [2002/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ESPRESSOMASCHINE MIT EINEM IN EINEM BRÜHZYLINDER VERSCHIEBBAREN BRÜHKOLBEN | [2002/27] | English: | ESPRESSO MACHINE WITH AN INFUSION PISTON DISPLACEABLE IN AN INFUSION CYLINDER | [2002/27] | French: | MACHINE A CAFE EXPRESS DOTEE D'UN PISTON D'EXTRACTION COULISSANT DANS UN CYLINDRE DE D'EXTRACTION | [2002/27] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/27] | 26.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DPA]EP0948927 (ELECTROLUX ZANUSSI VENDING S P [IT]) [DPA] 1,2 * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 9; figures 2,3 *; | [A]EP0564399 (COSMEC SRL [IT]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 46 - page 5, line 57; figure - *; | [DA]EP0756842 (EUGSTER FRISMAG AG [CH]) [DA] 3 * column 4, line 16 - column 6, line 8; figure - *; | [A]EP0885582 (SANDEN CORP [JP]) | by applicant | EP0270141 | EP0756842 | EP0948927 |