EP1242631 - MULTISPECIES FOOD TESTING AND CHARACTERIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conagra Grocery Products Companies 1645 West Valencia Fullerton, CA 92633 / US | [2002/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENSON, Andrew, K. 3301 N. Seventy-Second Street Lincoln, NE 68507 / US | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Casey, Lindsay Joseph, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | Casey, Lindsay Joseph, et al F. R. Kelly & Co. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 00992842.5 | 06.12.2000 | [2002/39] | WO2000US42586 | Priority number, date | US19990171004P | 15.12.1999 Original published format: US 171004 P | US20000639690 | 16.08.2000 Original published format: US 639690 | [2002/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0146477 | Date: | 28.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1242631 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.06.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12M1/34, C07H21/04 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
C12Q1/689 (EP,US);
Y02A90/10 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NAHRUNGSMITTELKONTROLLE VERSCHIEDENER SPEZIES UND CHARAKTERISIERUNG | [2002/39] | English: | MULTISPECIES FOOD TESTING AND CHARACTERIZATION | [2002/39] | French: | TEST ET CARACTERISATION MULTI-ESPECES DE PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES | [2002/39] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2002 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 05.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/31] | 13.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/31] | Request for further processing for: | 07.01.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 07.01.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.01.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9828444 (UNIV CHICAGO [US]) [X] 1,10-13 * page 5 - page 8; claims 1,2,9,10,14 *; | [DY]US5922591 (ANDERSON ROLFE C [US], et al) [DY] 6,7,9,22 * claims 2,5,14,39 *; | [DY]US6001564 (BERGERON MICHEL G [CA], et al) [DY] 19,20 * column 4 *; | [XY] - TROESCH ET AL, "MYCOBACTERIUM SPECIES IDENTIFICATION AND RIFAMPICIN RESISTANCE TESTING WITH HIGH-DENSITY DNA PROBE ARRAYS", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (199901), vol. 37, no. 1, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 49 - 55, XP002130858 [X] 10,12,14-18 * page 49 - page 59; table 1 * [Y] 3-5,8 | [XY] - DE BOER ENNE ET AL, "Methodology for detection and typing of foodborne microorganisms.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF FOOD MICROBIOLOGY, (19990915), vol. 50, no. 1-2, ISSN 0168-1605, pages 119 - 130, XP002239602 [X] 1,2,10,11 * page 124 * * page 129 * [Y] 3-9,22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-1605(99)00081-1 | [XY] - GUSCHIN D Y ET AL, "OLIGONUCLEOTIDE MICROCHIPS AS GENOSENSORS FOR DETERMINATIVE AND ENVIRONMENTAL STUDIES IN MICROBIOLOGY", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON,DC, US, (19970601), vol. 63, no. 6, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 2397 - 2402, XP002064989 [X] 10,13 * page 2397 - page 2401 * [Y] 3-5,8 | [DY] - BRUCKNER-LEA C J ET AL, "STRATEGIES FOR AUTOMATED SAMPLE PREPARATION, NUCLEIC ACID PURIFICATION, AND CONCENTRATION OF LOW TARGET NUMBER NUCLEIC ACIDS IN ENVIRONMENTAL AND FOOD PROCESSING SAMPLES", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (199811), vol. 3544, pages 63 - 71, XP000940855 [DY] 3-9,19,20,22 * page 63 * * pages 70-71 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.335782 | [Y] - SCHENA M ET AL, "Microarrays: biotechnology's discovery platform for functional genomics", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (19980701), vol. 16, no. 7, ISSN 0167-7799, pages 301 - 306, XP004145643 [Y] 6,7,9 * page 301 - page 306 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-7799(98)01219-0 | [Y] - VAN DER VOSSEN JOS M B M ET AL, "DNA based typing, identification and detection systems for food spoilage microorganisms: Development and implementation.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF FOOD MICROBIOLOGY, (1996), vol. 33, no. 1, ISSN 0168-1605, pages 35 - 49, XP002239603 [Y] 19,20 * page 43 - page 44 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-1605(96)01136-1 | [A] - WINZELER ELIZABETH A ET AL, "Fluorescence-based expression monitoring using microarrays.", METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, systems. 1999 Academic Press Inc.; Academic Press Ltd. 525 B Street, Suite 1900, San Diego, CA, 92101-4495, USA; 24-28 Oval Road, London, NW1 7DX, UK, (1999), vol. 306, ISBN 0-12-182207-9, pages 3 - 18, XP001147040 [A] 1-20,22 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0076-6879(99)06003-6 | International search | [Y]US5795717 (NAKAYAMA TOMOKO [JP], et al); | [Y]US5922591 (ANDERSON ROLFE C [US], et al); | [Y]US6001564 (BERGERON MICHEL G [CA], et al); | [XP]US6057100 (HEYNEKER HERBERT L [US]); | [XP]US6083763 (BALCH WILLIAM J [US]); | [Y] - TAUXE R.V., "Emerging foodborne disease: An evolving public health challenge", EMERGING INFECTIOUS DISEASES, (199710), vol. 3, no. 4, pages 425 - 434, XP002941378 | [Y] - BRUCKNER-LEA ET AL., "Strategies for automated sample preparation, nucleic acid purification and concentration of low target number nucleic acids in environmental and food processing samples", PROC. SPIE-INT. SOC. OPT. ENG., (1999), vol. 3544, pages 63 - 71, XP002941386 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.335782 | [Y] - BATT C.A., "Symposium: molecular probes - theory and application: molecular diagnostics for dairy-borne pathogens", J. DAIRY SCI., (1997), vol. 80, pages 220 - 229, XP002941379 |