EP1252253 - PROCESS FOR THE DEMERCAPTANIZATION OF PETROLEUM DISTILLATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DS2 Tech, Inc. 13074 U.S. Highway 52 Savanna, IL 61074 / US | [2002/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WISMANN, William 5166 Cortevistora Camarillo, CA 93012 / US | 02 /
GANGWAL, Santosh, K. 140 4th Avenue South Clinton, IA 52732 / US | [2002/44] | Representative(s) | Baker, Colin John Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/44] | Baker, Colin John Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00992927.4 | 13.12.2000 | [2002/44] | WO2000US42792 | Priority number, date | US19990170422P | 13.12.1999 Original published format: US 170422 P | [2002/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0142392 | Date: | 14.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1252253 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C10G1/00 | [2002/44] | CPC: |
C10G25/003 (EP,US);
C10G25/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/44] | Extension states | AL | 13.06.2002 | LT | 13.06.2002 | LV | 13.06.2002 | MK | 13.06.2002 | RO | 13.06.2002 | SI | 13.06.2002 | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR DEMARCAPTANISIERUNG VON ÖLDESTILLATEN | [2002/44] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE DEMERCAPTANIZATION OF PETROLEUM DISTILLATES | [2002/44] | French: | PROCEDE DE DEMERCAPTANISATION DES DISTILLATS DE PETROLE | [2002/44] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/44] | 29.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/43] | 18.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB763625 (GELSENBERG BENZIN AG) [X] 1-10 * page 1, line 66 - line 74; claims 1,16 * |