EP1254503 - BATTERY PACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2004 [2004/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Gillette Company Prudential Tower Building Boston, MA 02199 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states THE GILLETTE COMPANY Prudential Tower Building Boston, Massachusetts 02199 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEWES, Jeffrey 121 Rockland Street Holliston, MA 01746 / US | 02 /
YOPPOLO, Robert 6 Fairoak Circle New Millord, CT 06776 / US | 03 /
HULL, Matthew, P. 761 North Main Road Jamestown, RI 02835 / US | [2002/45] | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00993019.9 | 07.12.2000 | [2002/45] | WO2000US42652 | Priority number, date | US19990459196 | 10.12.1999 Original published format: US 459196 | [2002/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0148900 | Date: | 05.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1254503 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
H02J7/0063 (EP,US);
H02J7/007182 (EP,US);
H02J2207/20 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/45] | H02M1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIESATZ | [2002/45] | English: | BATTERY PACK | [2002/45] | French: | BLOC-PILES | [2002/45] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 17.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/19] | 02.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB2040609 (MALLORY & CO INC P R) [X] 1,5,7-11 * page 1, line 77 - line 114 * * page 4, line 94 - line 113 * [Y] 2-4,6,12-19; | [Y]US5204608 (KOENCK STEVEN E [US]) [Y] 2-4,6,12-19 * column 4 - column 5; figures 1,2 * * column 9, paragraph L *; | [A]US5656876 (RADLEY STEPHEN [GB], et al) [A] 1-19* abstract *; | [A]US5945806 (FAULK RICHARD A [US]) [A] 1-19 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 14 * |