EP1604164 - MOBILE CLEANING DEVICE FOR A HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2007 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J & W Reinigungssysteme Für Trockenkühlanlagen GmbH Heidestrasse 119 44866 Bochum / DE | [2006/40] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states J & W Reinigungssysteme Für Trockenkühlanlagen GmbH Heidestrasse 119 44866 Bochum / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JARESCH, Dirck Heidestrasse 119 44866 Bochum / DE | [2005/50] | Representative(s) | Kaewert, Klaus, et al Rechtsanwalt Gänsestrasse 4 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | Kaewert, Klaus, et al Rechtsanwalt, Gänsestrasse 4 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 00993070.2 | 07.11.2000 | [2005/50] | WO2000EP10984 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0239047 | Date: | 16.05.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1604164 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.05.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1604164 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F28G1/16, F28G15/02 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
F28G1/166 (EP);
F28G15/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2005/50] | Title | German: | MOBILE REINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR WÄRMETAUSCHER | [2005/50] | English: | MOBILE CLEANING DEVICE FOR A HEAT EXCHANGER | [2005/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE MOBILE DESTINE A DES ECHANGEURS THERMIQUES | [2005/50] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.09.2003 | Examination requested [2005/51] | 30.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 20.01.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 11.12.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 13.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/37] | Request for further processing for: | 08.06.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 08.06.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.07.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.09.2003 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   25.09.2003 | 24.09.2003 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   25.09.2003 | 24.09.2003 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   25.09.2003 | 24.09.2003 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   25.09.2003 | 24.09.2003 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   25.09.2003 | 24.09.2003 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   25.09.2003 | 24.09.2003 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   25.09.2003 | 24.09.2003 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   25.09.2003 | 24.09.2003 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   25.09.2003 | 24.09.2003 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   25.09.2003 | 24.09.2003 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   25.09.2003 | 24.09.2003 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   25.09.2003 | 24.09.2003 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   25.09.2003 | 24.09.2003 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   25.09.2003 | 24.09.2003 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   25.09.2003 | 24.09.2003 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   25.09.2003 | 24.09.2003 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   25.09.2003 | 24.09.2003 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   25.09.2003 | 24.09.2003 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   25.09.2003 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 24.09.2003 | M01   Fee paid on   25.09.2003 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 07.06.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   05.08.2003 | 30.11.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.01.2004 | 30.11.2005 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   12.01.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.10.2006 | FI | 04.10.2006 | IE | 04.10.2006 | TR | 04.10.2006 | LU | 07.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | DK | 04.01.2007 | SE | 04.01.2007 | GR | 05.01.2007 | PT | 16.03.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 04.10.2006 | |
IE | 04.10.2006 | ||
TR | 04.10.2006 | ||
LU | 07.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 04.10.2006 | |
IE | 04.10.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | FI | 04.10.2006 | |
IE | 04.10.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | FI | 04.10.2006 | |
IE | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 04.10.2006 | |
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | FI | 04.10.2006 | |
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 04.10.2006 | |
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 04.10.2006 | |
SE | 04.01.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3843409 (ICE C) [A] 1* column 3, line 13 - line 33; figure - *; | [A]FR2389090 (SVENSKA ROTOR MASKINER AB [SE]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]WO9204589 (BADER EMIL [PT]) [A] 1 * page 6 - page 10; figure - *; | [A]DE19800018 (JARESCH U WEGENER DIRK [DE]) [A] 1-34 * the whole document * |