EP1233854 - METHOD FOR MODIFYING WOODEN SURFACES BY ELECTRICAL DISCHARGES AT ATMOSPHERIC PRESSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Viöl, Wolfgang Heideweg 11 37139 Adelebsen / DE | [2002/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/35] | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | Patentanwälte Rehberg + Hüppe Nikolausberger Weg 62 37073 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00993244.3 | 09.11.2000 | [2002/35] | WO2000EP11083 | Priority number, date | DE1999157775 | 01.12.1999 Original published format: DE 19957775 | [2002/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0139944 | Date: | 07.06.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1233854 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1233854 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B27M1/06, H01T19/00 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
B27M1/06 (EP,US);
H01T19/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MODIFIZIERUNG VON HOLZOBERFLÄCHEN DURCH ELEKTRISCHE ENTLADUNG UNTER ATMOSPHÄRENDRUCK | [2002/35] | English: | METHOD FOR MODIFYING WOODEN SURFACES BY ELECTRICAL DISCHARGES AT ATMOSPHERIC PRESSURE | [2002/35] | French: | PROCEDE POUR MODIFIER DES SURFACES DE BOIS PAR DECHARGE ELECTRIQUE A LA PRESSION ATMOSPHERIQUE | [2002/35] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 01.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.01.2004 | FI | 02.01.2004 | IE | 02.01.2004 | IT | 02.01.2004 | NL | 02.01.2004 | TR | 02.01.2004 | DK | 02.04.2004 | GR | 02.04.2004 | SE | 02.04.2004 | ES | 13.04.2004 | PT | 02.06.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | CY | 02.01.2004 | |
FI | 02.01.2004 | ||
IE | 02.01.2004 | ||
IT | 02.01.2004 | ||
NL | 02.01.2004 | ||
TR | 02.01.2004 | ||
DK | 02.04.2004 | ||
GR | 02.04.2004 | ||
SE | 02.04.2004 | ||
ES | 13.04.2004 | ||
Former [2007/09] | CY | 02.01.2004 | |
FI | 02.01.2004 | ||
IE | 02.01.2004 | ||
NL | 02.01.2004 | ||
TR | 02.01.2004 | ||
DK | 02.04.2004 | ||
GR | 02.04.2004 | ||
SE | 02.04.2004 | ||
ES | 13.04.2004 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 02.01.2004 | |
IE | 02.01.2004 | ||
NL | 02.01.2004 | ||
TR | 02.01.2004 | ||
DK | 02.04.2004 | ||
GR | 02.04.2004 | ||
SE | 02.04.2004 | ||
ES | 13.04.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | FI | 02.01.2004 | |
IE | 02.01.2004 | ||
NL | 02.01.2004 | ||
DK | 02.04.2004 | ||
GR | 02.04.2004 | ||
SE | 02.04.2004 | ||
ES | 13.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | FI | 02.01.2004 | |
IE | 02.01.2004 | ||
DK | 02.04.2004 | ||
GR | 02.04.2004 | ||
SE | 02.04.2004 | ||
ES | 13.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 02.01.2004 | |
DK | 02.04.2004 | ||
GR | 02.04.2004 | ||
SE | 02.04.2004 | ||
ES | 13.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | FI | 02.01.2004 | |
GR | 02.04.2004 | ||
SE | 02.04.2004 | ||
ES | 13.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 02.01.2004 | |
GR | 02.04.2004 | ||
SE | 02.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 02.01.2004 | |
SE | 02.04.2004 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0178907 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8 * page 13, line 20 - page 14, line 7; figure 15 * * page 22, line 9 - line 13 * * page 23, line 1 - line 12 * * page 24, line 25 - page 25, line 4 * [A] 6; | [DA]US5215637 (WILLIAMS R LEE [US]); | [DA]DE19718287 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) |