EP1177685 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR BROADCASTING EMERGENCY WARNINGS TO RADIO AND TELEVISON RECEIVERS IN LOW POWER MODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUFFMAN, Gruen, W. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | White, Andrew Gordon Philips Intellectual Property & Standards Cross Oak Lane Redhill Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | White, Andrew Gordon Philips Intellectual Property & Standards Cross Oak Lane Redhill Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2002/06] | White, Andrew Gordon Philips Corporate Intellectual Property, Cross Oak Lane Redhill, #Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00993475.3 | 01.12.2000 | [2002/06] | WO2000EP12143 | Priority number, date | US19990464863 | 16.12.1999 Original published format: US 464863 | [2002/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0145386 | Date: | 21.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1177685 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/44 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
H04N7/08 (EP);
G08B21/10 (EP,KR);
G08B25/08 (KR);
G08B25/085 (EP);
G08B27/00 (KR);
H04H20/59 (EP);
H04H60/13 (EP);
H04N21/235 (EP);
H04N21/2665 (EP);
H04N21/435 (EP);
H04N21/4383 (EP);
H04N21/44209 (EP);
H04N21/4882 (EP);
H04N21/6543 (EP);
H04N21/814 (EP);
H04N5/445 (EP);
H04W52/0229 (EP);
H04N5/63 (EP);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM SENDEN VON NOTFALLWARNUNGEN ZU RUNDFUNK- UND FERNSEHEMPFÄNGERN IN EINEM NIEDERSTROMVERBRAUCHMODUS | [2002/06] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR BROADCASTING EMERGENCY WARNINGS TO RADIO AND TELEVISON RECEIVERS IN LOW POWER MODE | [2002/06] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE DIFFUSER DES AVERTISSEMENTS D'URGENCE SUR DES RECEPTEURS RADIO ET DE TELEVISISON EN MODE VEILLE | [2002/06] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/29] | 07.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/05] | 21.08.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/05] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS60127821 ; | [Y]JPS62189822 ; | [A]JPS61112436 ; | [A]JPH0946257 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851115), vol. 009, no. 288, Database accession no. (E - 358), & JP60127821 A 19850708 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880202), vol. 012, no. 035, Database accession no. (E - 579), & JP62189822 A 19870819 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861009), vol. 010, no. 297, Database accession no. (E - 444), & JP61112436 A 19860530 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970630), vol. 1997, no. 06, & JP09046257 A 19970214 (NOMURA MASAHIRO) [A] 1-12 * abstract * |