blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1261606

EP1261606 - SUBSTITUTED OXAZOLIDINONES AND THEIR USE IN THE FIELD OF BLOOD COAGULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.12.2005
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip30.12.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.02.2006  [2006/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer HealthCare AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[2004/01]
Former [2002/49]For all designated states
Bayer Aktiengesellschaft
51368 Leverkusen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / STRAUB, Alexander
Moospfad 30
42113 Wuppertal / DE
02 / LAMPE, Thomas
Briller Strasse 46
42105 Wuppertal / DE
03 / POHLMANN, Jens
Kronenstrasse 14
42285 Wuppertal / DE
04 / RÖHRIG, Susanne
Buschstrasse 20
45276 Essen / DE
05 / PERZBORN, Elisabeth
Am Tescher Busch 13
42327 Wuppertal / DE
06 / SCHLEMMER, Karl-Heinz
Wildsteig 22a
42113 Wuppertal / DE
07 / PERNERSTORFER, Joseph
Alsenstrasse 19
42109 Wuppertal / DE
 [2002/49]
Application number, filing date00993610.511.12.2000
[2002/49]
WO2000EP12492
Priority number, dateDE199916292424.12.1999         Original published format: DE 19962924
[2002/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO0147919
Date:05.07.2001
Language:DE
[2001/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1261606
Date:04.12.2002
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2002/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1261606
Date:23.02.2005
Language:DE
[2005/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.07.2001
ClassificationIPC:C07D413/14, C07D413/12, C07D417/14, A61K31/42, A61P7/00
[2002/49]
CPC:
C07D498/04 (EP,KR,US); A61K31/5377 (EP,KR,US); A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP); A61P35/00 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP); A61P7/02 (EP); A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP); A61P9/10 (EP); C07D333/38 (EP,KR,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,KR,US); C07D413/10 (EP,KR,US); C07D413/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,KR,US); C07D417/14 (EP,KR,US); C07D495/04 (EP,KR,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/49]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LT24.07.2002
LV24.07.2002
MK24.07.2002
RO24.07.2002
SI24.07.2002
TitleGerman:SUBSTITUIERTE OXAZOLIDINONE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG IM GEBIET DER BLUTGERINNUNG[2002/49]
English:SUBSTITUTED OXAZOLIDINONES AND THEIR USE IN THE FIELD OF BLOOD COAGULATION[2002/49]
French:OXAZOLIDINONES SUBSTITUEES ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS LE DOMAINE DE LA COAGULATION SANGUINE[2002/49]
Entry into regional phase24.07.2002National basic fee paid 
24.07.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
24.07.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.06.2001Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.07.2002Examination requested  [2002/49]
20.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
23.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.2004Fee for grant paid
17.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04027037.3  / EP1526132
Opposition(s)24.11.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 04
03.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0645376  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15* example -; claim 1 *;
 [DX]WO9931092  (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [DX] 1-15 * claim - * *Beispiel 1: Seite 37, Zeilen 29-31; Seite 40, Zeilen 30-31* *Beispiel 2: Seite 45, Zeilen 34-36; Seite 48, Zeilen 8-9* *Beispiel 5: Seite 54, Zeilen 30-32; Seite 56, Zeilen 9-11*;
 [A]  - BECKER M R ET AL, "Synthesis, SAR and in vivo activity of novel thienopyridine sulfonamide pyrrolidinones as factor Xa inhibitors", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS,GB,OXFORD, (19990920), vol. 9, no. 18, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 2753 - 2758, XP004179965 [A] 1-15 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(99)00466-7
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.