EP1159499 - MODULAR TENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DECATHLON 4, Boulevard de Mons 59650 Villeneuve d'Ascq / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states DECATHLON 4, boulevard de Mons 59650 Villeneuve d'Ascq / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOULANGE, David 108, boulevard Montébello F-59800 Lille / FR | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Hennion, Jean-Claude, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie Immeuble Eurocentre (Euralille) 179 Boulevard de Turin 59777 Lille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | Hennion, Jean-Claude, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 27bis, rue du Vieux Faubourg 59800 Lille / FR | Application number, filing date | 00993728.5 | 22.12.2000 | [2001/49] | WO2000FR03671 | Priority number, date | FR19990016859 | 31.12.1999 Original published format: FR 9916859 | [2001/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0149958 | Date: | 12.07.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1159499 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1159499 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E04H15/18, E04H15/40 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
E04H15/18 (EP,US);
E04H15/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODULARES ZELT | [2001/49] | English: | MODULAR TENT | [2001/49] | French: | TENTE MODULAIRE | [2001/49] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 24.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.02.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2006 | CY | 09.08.2006 | FI | 09.08.2006 | IE | 09.08.2006 | IT | 09.08.2006 | NL | 09.08.2006 | TR | 09.08.2006 | DK | 09.11.2006 | SE | 09.11.2006 | DE | 10.11.2006 | GR | 10.11.2006 | LU | 22.12.2006 | BE | 31.12.2006 | CH | 31.12.2006 | LI | 31.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | PT | 09.01.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IE | 09.08.2006 | ||
IT | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
TR | 09.08.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
DE | 10.11.2006 | ||
GR | 10.11.2006 | ||
LU | 22.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
CH | 31.12.2006 | ||
LI | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IE | 09.08.2006 | ||
IT | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
DE | 10.11.2006 | ||
GR | 10.11.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
CH | 31.12.2006 | ||
LI | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IE | 09.08.2006 | ||
IT | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
DE | 10.11.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
CH | 31.12.2006 | ||
LI | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IE | 09.08.2006 | ||
IT | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
DE | 10.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IE | 09.08.2006 | ||
IT | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IE | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
PT | 09.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
IE | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 09.08.2006 | |
FI | 09.08.2006 | ||
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 09.08.2006 | |
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
DK | 09.11.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 09.08.2006 | |
NL | 09.08.2006 | ||
SE | 09.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 09.08.2006 | |
SE | 09.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4063566 (MILLERIOUX BRUNO) [A] 1,4,7 * column 2, line 22 - line 62 * * column 3, line 50 - line 59 ** figures 1-5,8,9 *; | [XA]US5394897 (RITCHEY MICHAEL T [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9 * the whole document * [A] 4,8 |