EP1159183 - RAIL SWITCH LOCK FOR POINTS TONGUES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 09.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schreck-Mieves GmbH Krückenweg 113 44225 Dortmund / DE | [2001/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÖCKER, Jens Heidbergstrasse 69 22846 Norderstedt / DE | 02 /
GRUNWALD, Dieter Opketal 9 49152 Bad Essen / DE | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Huyssenallee 68 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Huyssenallee 100 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00993777.2 | 29.12.2000 | [2001/49] | WO2000EP13318 | Priority number, date | DE20001000804 | 11.01.2000 Original published format: DE 10000804 | [2001/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0151332 | Date: | 19.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1159183 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1159183 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B61L5/10 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
B61L5/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WEICHENVERSCHLUSS FÜR WEICHENZUNGEN | [2001/49] | English: | RAIL SWITCH LOCK FOR POINTS TONGUES | [2001/49] | French: | SYSTEME DE VERROUILLAGE D'AIGUILLE POUR LAMES D'AIGUILLE | [2001/49] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 31.10.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 21.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.05.2002 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 12.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 09.10.2002 | GR | 09.10.2002 | IE | 09.10.2002 | TR | 09.10.2002 | LU | 29.12.2002 | CY | 31.12.2002 | DK | 09.01.2003 | PT | 09.01.2003 | SE | 09.01.2003 | ES | 29.04.2003 | MC | 01.07.2003 | [2007/10] |
Former [2006/51] | FI | 09.10.2002 | |
GR | 09.10.2002 | ||
IE | 09.10.2002 | ||
TR | 09.10.2002 | ||
LU | 29.12.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
PT | 09.01.2003 | ||
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
MC | 01.07.2003 | ||
Former [2006/44] | FI | 09.10.2002 | |
GR | 09.10.2002 | ||
IE | 09.10.2002 | ||
LU | 29.12.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
PT | 09.01.2003 | ||
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
MC | 01.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | FI | 09.10.2002 | |
GR | 09.10.2002 | ||
IE | 09.10.2002 | ||
LU | 29.12.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
PT | 09.01.2003 | ||
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | FI | 09.10.2002 | |
GR | 09.10.2002 | ||
IE | 09.10.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
PT | 09.01.2003 | ||
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | FI | 09.10.2002 | |
GR | 09.10.2002 | ||
IE | 09.10.2002 | ||
PT | 09.01.2003 | ||
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 09.10.2002 | |
GR | 09.10.2002 | ||
IE | 09.10.2002 | ||
PT | 09.01.2003 | ||
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/42] | GR | 09.10.2002 | |
IE | 09.10.2002 | ||
PT | 09.01.2003 | ||
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 09.10.2002 | |
PT | 09.01.2003 | ||
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 09.01.2003 | |
SE | 09.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 09.01.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR550064 (M.PAUL LEBEAU) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-8 * * column 6, lines 25-55 * * column 7, lines 1-10 *; | [A]WO9503199 (BUTZBACHER WEICHENBAU GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-7 * * page 1, lines 1-60 * * page 6, lines 1-60 * * page 7, lines 1-60 * * page 8, lines 1-70 * * page 9, lines 1-70 *; | [A]DE4324883 (BUTZBACHER WEICHENBAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-7 * * column 3, lines 1-70 * * column 4, lines 1-70 ** column 5, lines 1-35 *; | [A]EP0723901 (PEDDINGHAUS CARL DAN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-7 * * column 1, lines 1-20 * * column 6, lines 5-60 * * column 7, lines 1-60 *; | [PA]WO0002759 (SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [PA] 1-12 * figures 1-13 * * page 2, lines 5-40 * * page 3, lines 1-40 * |