EP1313360 - AN IMPROVED PROCESS FOR CULTIVATION OF ALGAE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Council of Scientific and Industrial Research;an Indian Reg. body incorporated under Reg. of Societies Act (Act XXI of 1860) Rafi Marg New Delhi 110 001 / IN | [N/P] |
Former [2006/43] | For all designated states Council of Scientific and Industrial Research;an Indian Reg. body incorporated under Reg. of Societies Act (Act XXI of 1860) Rafi Marg New Delhi 110 001 / IN | ||
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states Council of Scientific and Industrial Research;an Indian Reg. body incorporated under Reg. of Societies Act (Act XXI of 1860) Rafi Marg New Delhi 110 001 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reddy, Radhakrishn Chennur Central Salt & Marine Chem. Res. Inst. Bhavnagar Gujarat 364002 / IN | 02 /
Mairh, Om Prakash Central Salt & Marine Chem. Res. Inst. Bhavnagar Gujarat 364 002 / IN | 03 /
Kumar, Guru Rajakrishna Central Salt & Marine Chem. Res. Inst. Bhavnagar Gujarat 364 002 / IN | 04 /
Eswaran, Kuruppanan Central Salt & Marine Chem. Res. Inst. Bhavnagar Gujarat 364 002 / IN | 05 /
Subba RAO Peddi, Venkata Central Salt & Marine Ch em. Res. Inst. Bhavnagar Gujarat 364 002 / IN | 06 /
Mody, Kalpana Haresh Central Salt & Marine Chem. res. Inst. Bhavnagar Gujarat 364 002 / IN | 07 /
Ghosh, Pushpito Kumar Central Salt & Marine Chem. Res. Inst. Bhavnagar Gujarat 364 002 / IN | [2003/22] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00993887.9 | 31.08.2000 | [2003/22] | WO2000IN00084 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0217707 | Date: | 07.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1313360 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.03.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1313360 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A01G33/00, A01H4/00 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
A01H4/008 (EP,US);
A01G33/00 (EP,US);
A01H13/00 (EP,US);
A01H4/005 (EP,US);
C12N1/12 (EP,US);
Y02A40/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2003/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ALGENKULTIVIERUNG | [2003/22] | English: | AN IMPROVED PROCESS FOR CULTIVATION OF ALGAE | [2003/22] | French: | PROCEDE AMELIORE DE CULTURE D'ALGUES | [2003/22] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/22] | 15.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2204591 (PAISLEY COLLEGE OF TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9422286 (UNIV NORTHEASTERN [US]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A] - DAWES C J ET AL, "Clonal propagation of Eucheuma denticulatum and Kappaphycus alvarezii for Philippine sea weed farm.", HYDROBIOLOGIA, Fourteenth International Seaweed Symposium;Brest, France; August 16-21, 1992, (1993), vol. 260-261, ISSN 0018-8158, pages 379 - 383, XP000993573 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00049044 | [A] - DAWES C J ET AL, "BRANCH MICROPROPAGULE AND TISSUE CULTURE OF THE RED ALGAE EUCHEUMA-DENTICULATUM AND KAPPAPHYCUS-ALVAREZII FARMED IN THE PHILIPPINES", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYCOLOGY, (1991), vol. 3, no. 3, ISSN 0921-8971, pages 247 - 258, XP000993577 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - KIRIHARA SHINJI ET AL, "Axenic tissue culture of Sargassum confusum C. Agardh (Phaeophyta) as a source of seeds for artificial marine forests.", JOURNAL OF MARINE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1997), vol. 5, no. 2-3, ISSN 0941-2905, pages 142 - 146, XP001002022 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - JIN HYUNG-JOO ET AL, "Gelling agents for tissue culture of the seaweed Hizikia fusiformis.", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYCOLOGY, (1997), vol. 9, no. 6, ISSN 0921-8971, pages 489 - 493, XP001002012 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1007925202219 | [A] - MAIRH O P ET AL, "Culture of marine red alga Kappaphycus striatum (Schmitz) Doty on the Saurashtra region, west coast of India.", INDIAN JOURNAL OF MARINE SCIENCES, (1995), vol. 24, no. 1, ISSN 0379-5136, pages 24 - 31, XP000993574 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [A] - SAGA N ET AL, "AXENIC TISSUE CULTURE AND CALLUS FORMATION OF THE MARINE BROWN ALGA LAMINARIA-ANGUSTATA", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1983), Database accession no. PREV198477082270, XP002167402 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | [ ] - BULLETIN OF THE JAPANESE SOCIETY OF SCIENTIFIC FISHERIES, (1983), vol. 49, no. 10, ISSN 0021-5392, pages 1561 - 1564 | [A] - LIU XUEWN ET AL, "Explant axenisation for tissue culture in marine macroalgae.", CHINESE JOURNAL OF OCEANOLOGY AND LIMNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, no. 3, ISSN 0254-4059, pages 268 - 277, XP001002041 [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | Examination | - REDDY C.R.K. ET AL, "In vitro somatic embryogenesis and regeneration of somatic embryos from pigmneted callus of Kappaphycus alvarezii (Doty) Doty (Rhodophyta, Gigartinales)", J. PHYCOL, (2003), vol. 39, pages 610 - 616 |