EP1182876 - Method for video transmission over a network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | ||
Former [2002/09] | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 7839 Churchill Way, Mail Station 3999 Dallas, Texas 75251 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Budgavi, Madhukar 16500 Lauder Lane, No.11101 Texas 75248, Dallas / US | [2002/09] | Representative(s) | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Limited European Patent Department 3rd Floor 401 Grafton Gate Milton Keynes MK9 1AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | Holt, Michael Texas Instruments Ltd., EPD MS/13, 800 Pavilion Drive Northampton Business Park, Northampton NN4 7YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 01000262.4 | 02.07.2001 | [2002/09] | Priority number, date | US20000215457P | 30.06.2000 Original published format: US 215457 P | [2002/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1182876 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1182876 | Date: | 18.02.2004 | [2004/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1182876 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24, H04N7/50 | [2002/09] | CPC: |
H04N21/658 (EP);
H04N19/114 (EP);
H04N19/137 (EP);
H04N19/149 (EP);
H04N19/152 (EP);
H04N19/159 (EP);
H04N19/166 (EP);
H04N19/172 (EP);
H04N19/177 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/46] |
Former [2002/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Videoübertragung über ein Netzwerk | [2002/09] | English: | Method for video transmission over a network | [2002/09] | French: | Méthode de transmission vidéo sur un réseau | [2002/09] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/43] | 05.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - STUHLMUELLER K ET AL, "ANALYSIS OF VIDEO TRANSMISSION OVER LOSSY CHANNELS", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (200006), vol. 18, no. 6, ISSN 0733-8716, pages 1012 - 1032, XP001149337 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/49.848253 | [A] - STUHLMUELLER K ET AL, "ADAPTIVE OPTIMAL INTRA UPDATE FOR LOSSY VIDEO TRANSMISSION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA, US, (20000620), vol. 4067, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 286 - 295, XP008015095 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.386645 | [A] - FARBER N ET AL, "Analysis of error propagation in hybrid video coding with application to error resilience", IMAGE PROCESSING, 1999. ICIP 99. PROCEEDINGS. 1999 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON KOBE, JAPAN 24-28 OCT. 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19991024), ISBN 0-7803-5467-2, pages 550 - 554, XP010368931 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.1999.822956 | [A] - RAMANUJAN R S ET AL, "Adaptive streaming of MPEG video over IP networks", LOCAL COMPUTER NETWORKS, 1997. PROCEEDINGS., 22ND ANNUAL CONFERENCE ON MINNEAPOLIS, MN, USA 2-5 NOV. 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19971102), ISBN 0-8186-8141-1, pages 398 - 409, XP010252445 [A] 1-3,5 * abstract * *Section 3 - Architecture of Adaptive Video Streaming, pages 401-406* * figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LCN.1997.631009 | [A] - GUERRI J C ET AL, "A feedback packet-level error control for real-time applications in wireless networks", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1999. VTC 1999 - FALL. IEEE VTS 50TH AMSTERDAM, NETHERLANDS 19-22 SEPT. 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19990919), ISBN 0-7803-5435-4, pages 879 - 883, XP010353105 [A] 1-3,5 * abstract * *Section 3 - Feedback Packet-Level Control,pages 880-881* |