EP1277675 - Handling and positioning of printing plates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.2004 [2004/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glunz & Jensen A/S Haslevvej 13 4100 Ringstead / DK | [2003/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hammersma, Frans Willow Pond House Stuston, Suffolk IP 21 4AB / GB | 02 /
Bos, Jan Koningsvaren 96 9561 DP, Ter Apel / NL | [2003/04] | Representative(s) | Harrison, Ivor Stanley, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | Harrison, Ivor Stanley, et al Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 01000304.4 | 18.07.2001 | [2003/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1277675 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65G13/071, B65G47/54, B65G39/02 | [2003/04] | CPC: |
B65G13/10 (EP);
B65G1/0478 (EP);
B65G13/071 (EP);
B65G39/025 (EP);
B65G47/54 (EP);
H05K13/0061 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/41] |
Former [2003/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Handhabung und Positionierung von Druckplatten | [2003/04] | English: | Handling and positioning of printing plates | [2003/04] | French: | Manipulation et positionnement des plaques d'impression | [2003/04] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/17] | 18.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.09.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 01.09.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000219308 ; | [X]US6065665 (MCKINNON LAURA LYNN [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 4, line 36 - line 41 * * column 5, line 64 - line 67 * * claims 1,2,4-6,10,14-17 * * figures 5,12,13 *; | [X]GB2348631 (WHITTLES PAUL [GB]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 11, & JP2000219308 A 20000808 (SR ENGINEERING KK;IGUCHI KIKO SEISAKUSHO:KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |