EP1196001 - Mobile telephone with secure unlocking of telecommunication network access and method of unlocking therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sagem SA 27 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states SAGEM S.A. 27, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE CORDOUE, Stanislas domicilié Cabinet Christian SCHMIT et Associés 8 95 000, CERGY / FR | [2002/15] | Representative(s) | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie SCHMIT CHRETIEN 8, Place du Ponceau 95000 Cergy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie Cabinet Christian Schmit et Associés, 8, place du Ponceau 95000 Cergy / FR | Application number, filing date | 01000517.1 | 04.10.2001 | [2002/15] | Priority number, date | FR20000012695 | 04.10.2000 Original published format: FR 0012695 | [2002/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1196001 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1196001 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [2002/15] | CPC: |
H04W8/265 (EP);
G06F21/35 (EP);
H04L9/0894 (EP);
H04L9/14 (EP);
H04W12/03 (EP);
H04W12/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2003/01] |
Former [2002/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Mobiltelefon mit gesicherter Freigabe des Netzwerkzugangs und entsprechendes Freigabeverfahren | [2003/18] | English: | Mobile telephone with secure unlocking of telecommunication network access and method of unlocking therefor | [2002/15] | French: | Téléphone mobile avec déverrouillage sécurisé de l'accès à un réseau de télécommunication et procédé de déverrouillage associé | [2002/15] |
Former [2002/15] | Mobiltelefon mit gesicherte Freigabe des Netzwerkzugangs und übereinstimmendes Freigabeverfahren | Examination procedure | 06.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/21] | 08.03.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5386468 (AKIYAMA RYOTA [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,11,12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19733662 (DEUTSCHE TELEKOM MOBIL [DE]) [A] 1-3,10-12* the whole document *; | [XA]US6124799 (PARKER JOHN PATRICK [GB]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-11 * the whole document * [A] 3,12 |