EP1170031 - A cancer thermotherapy device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2004 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIIGATA UNIVERSITY 8050, Nino-Cho, Ikarashi Niigata City, Niigata Pref. / JP | [2002/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saito, Yohiaki 7794-20, Ikarashi-ichinocho Niigata City, Niigata Pref. / JP | [2002/02] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/02] | von Hellfeld, Axel, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. WUESTHOFF & WUESTHOFF Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01100138.5 | 15.01.2001 | [2002/02] | Priority number, date | JP20000201856 | 04.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000201856 | [2002/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1170031 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1170031 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | [2002/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/40, A61N5/04 | [2002/25] | CPC: |
A61N1/403 (EP,US);
A61N1/06 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2002/02] | A61N1/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/11] |
Former [2002/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Thermotherapievorrichtung zur Behandlung von Krebs | [2002/02] | English: | A cancer thermotherapy device | [2002/02] | French: | Appareil de thermothérapie destiné au traitement du cancer | [2002/02] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2001 | Examination requested [2002/02] | 19.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2047099 (MORTON & ASSOCIATES D L) [Y] 2,4 * figures 3,8 *; | [XY]US4316453 (HARRISON WILLIAM H) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 9 - column 2, line 23 * * the whole document * [Y] 3,5; | [XY]US4586516 (TURNER PAUL F [US]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 7 - column 16, line 5; figures 3,5,8 * * column 3, line 32 - column 11, line 62 * [Y] 2-6,8-14; | [Y]EP0595104 (ANT NACHRICHTENTECH [DE]) [Y] 9-14* columns 1-2 *; | [Y]DE19726570 (RETRONIKA GES FUER TELEKOMMUNI [DE]) [Y] 6 * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE19727967 (PODOBNIK HELMUT [DE]) [Y] 8 * column 1, lines 2-68 * |