EP1099546 - Printing stamp and method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/20] | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | ||
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 15-1 Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken 467-8561 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taira, Hiroshi 1-14-2-205, Hanaike Ichinomiya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | Senior, Alan Murray J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 01100238.3 | 18.11.1996 | [2001/20] | Priority number, date | JP19950325108 | 20.11.1995 Original published format: JP 32510895 | [2001/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1099546 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1099546 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | [2001/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1099546 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B41C1/055 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
B41K1/50 (EP,US);
B41C1/055 (EP,US);
B41M5/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2001/20] | Title | German: | Druckstempel und Verfahren zu seiner Hertellung | [2001/20] | English: | Printing stamp and method therefor | [2001/20] | French: | Tampon et son procédé de fabrication | [2001/20] | Examination procedure | 02.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/20] | 16.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96308324.1 / EP0774352 | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.05.2006 | BE | 17.05.2006 | CH | 17.05.2006 | FR | 17.05.2006 | LI | 17.05.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2007/50] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
BE | 17.05.2006 | ||
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/36] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
BE | 17.05.2006 | ||
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
BE | 17.05.2006 | ||
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 17.05.2006 | |
CH | 17.05.2006 | ||
LI | 17.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 17.05.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1447253 (GEVAERT PHOTO PROD NV) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US3942440 (RITZERFELD GERHARD) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [X]GB1502299 (LOGETRONICS INC [US]) [X] 1-9 * claims 1,3,5 * * page 3, line 86 - line 100 *; | [X]WO9509730 (MITSUBISHI PENCIL CO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * figures 2,7 *; | [XP]GB2297717 (GEN CO LIMITED [JP]) [XP] 1 * examples 1-5 * |