EP1221407 - Secure fastening means for bicycle mudguard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2004 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.02.2005 [2005/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huang, Kuei C. No. 10, King-Men Street Ban-Chiau City Taipei Hsien / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2002/28] | For all designated states Huang, Kuei C. No. 10, King-Men Street Ban-Chiau City, Taipei Hsien / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/28] | Representative(s) | Simons, Johannes Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/28] | Simons, Johannes, Dipl.-Ing. Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8 A 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 01100244.1 | 03.01.2001 | [2002/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1221407 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B62J15/02 | [2002/28] | CPC: |
B62J15/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/14] |
Former [2002/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Sicherheits-Rasteinrichtung für Fahrradschutzbleche | [2002/28] | English: | Secure fastening means for bicycle mudguard | [2002/28] | French: | Fixation de sécurité pour garde-boue de bicyclette | [2002/28] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 05.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/05] | 03.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0921059 (HUANG KUEI C [TW]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP1036731 (Z E F A L [FR]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE9013149U (H. HEMMELSKAMP GMBH & CO. KG) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP1052167 (HESLING B V [NL]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | EP0458306 |