EP1116575 - Method and device for continuous forming of H-shaped FRP member [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/29] | Continuous forming device of h-shaped frp member | ||
[2005/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAMCO CORPORATION 6-11-25 Osawa Mitaka Tokyo / JP | [2006/12] |
Former [2001/29] | For all designated states JAMCO CORPORATION 6-11-25 Osawa Mitaka, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kasai, Toru c/o Jamco Corporation, 6-11-25, Osawa Mitaka, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Asari, Kazumi c/o Jamco Corporation, 6-11-25, Osawa Mitaka, Tokyo / JP | [2001/29] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 01100389.4 | 05.01.2001 | [2001/29] | Priority number, date | JP20000002437 | 11.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000002437 | [2001/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1116575 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1116575 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | [2002/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1116575 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/52, B29C70/50 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
B29C70/50 (EP,US);
B29C70/525 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1008 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/29] | B29C70/52 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2003/10] |
Former [2001/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlage zur kontinuierlichen Herstellung eines H-formigen Gegenstands aus faserverstärktem Kunststoff | [2005/42] | English: | Method and device for continuous forming of H-shaped FRP member | [2005/42] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la fabrication en continu d'un objet en forme de H en matière plastique renforcée par des fibres | [2005/42] |
Former [2001/29] | Anlage zur kontinuierlichen Herstellung eines H-formigen Gegenstands aus faserverstärktem Kunststoff | ||
Former [2001/29] | Continuous forming device of h-shaped frp member | ||
Former [2001/29] | Appareil pour la fabrication en continu d'un objet en forme de H en matière plastique renforcée par des fibres | Examination procedure | 20.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/03] | 13.12.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.04.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 13.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.02.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.02.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5043128 (UMEDA KATSUHIKO [JP]) [X] 1-4 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 57 * * column 5, line 20 - line 29 *; | [DX]US4151031 (GOAD ROBERT C [US], et al) [DX] 1-4 * figure 3 *; | [DA]JPH02102029 ; | [A]US2779388 (QUOSS HENRY N) [A] 2 * column 2, line 45 - line 52 *; | [A]DE2165470 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG) [A] 1 * figure 3 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900704), vol. 014, no. 311, Database accession no. (M - 0994), & JP02102029 A 19900413 (JAMCO CORP) [DA] 1 * abstract * |