EP1116679 - Front-edge stop device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.2005 [2005/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LTG Mailänder GmbH Wernerstrasse 119 - 129 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [2001/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dieter, Klepser Carl-Benz-Str.6 74366 Kirchheim / DE | [2001/29] | Representative(s) | Grosse, Rainer, et al Gleiss Grosse Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | Grosse, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing., et al Gleiss & Grosse Patentanwaltskanzlei, Maybachstrasse 6A 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01100410.8 | 08.01.2001 | [2001/29] | Priority number, date | DE2000200247U | 12.01.2000 Original published format: DE 20000247 U | [2001/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1116679 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1116679 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | [2002/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1116679 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65H9/10, B65H5/02 | [2001/29] | CPC: |
B65H9/101 (EP);
B65H11/007 (EP);
B65H2404/232 (EP);
B65H2701/173 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2003/36] |
Former [2001/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorderkantenanschlagvorrichtung | [2001/29] | English: | Front-edge stop device | [2001/29] | French: | Dispositif d'alignement de bord avant | [2001/29] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 12.06.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, FR, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 11.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.03.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.03.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4641742 (IGARASHI MAKOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 21 - line 47 * * figure 2 *; | [A]DE19525115 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2804759 (GULF & WESTERN MFG CO) [A] 1,2 * page 16 - page 18 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3303331 (WILL E C H GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US4398629 (WILLIAMSON CALVIN C [US]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 46 - line 61 * * figures 1,2,5A-5E *; | [A]US2811355 (NORDQUIST RONALD E J) [A] 1 * the whole document * |