EP1138212 - Roasting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfred C. G. Nolte KG Dieselstrasse 2 21465 Reinbek / DE | [2006/47] |
Former [2001/40] | For all designated states Alfred C. G. Nolte KG Dieselstrasse 2 21465 Reinbek / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Küger, Andreas, Dipl.-Phys. Sonstkoppel 7 21465 Reinbek / DE | [2001/40] | Representative(s) | Jaeschke, Rainer Grüner Weg 77 22851 Norderstedt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/40] | Jaeschke, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing. Grüner Weg 77 22851 Norderstedt / DE | Application number, filing date | 01100431.4 | 08.01.2001 | [2001/40] | Priority number, date | DE2000205577U | 24.03.2000 Original published format: DE 20005577 U | [2001/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1138212 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1138212 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | [2003/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1138212 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A23N12/08 | [2001/40] | CPC: |
A23N12/083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/40] | Title | German: | Röstvorrichtung | [2001/40] | English: | Roasting apparatus | [2001/40] | French: | Appareil de torréfaction | [2003/29] |
Former [2001/40] | Appareil de torrefaction | Examination procedure | 10.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/12] | 30.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.03.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.11.2006 | FI | 22.11.2006 | IE | 22.11.2006 | IT | 22.11.2006 | NL | 22.11.2006 | TR | 22.11.2006 | LU | 08.01.2007 | BE | 31.01.2007 | MC | 31.01.2007 | DK | 22.02.2007 | SE | 22.02.2007 | GR | 23.02.2007 | ES | 05.03.2007 | PT | 23.04.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 22.11.2006 | |
FI | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
LU | 08.01.2007 | ||
BE | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 22.11.2006 | |
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | FI | 22.11.2006 | |
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 22.11.2006 | |
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | FI | 22.11.2006 | |
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | FI | 22.11.2006 | |
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 22.11.2006 | |
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 22.11.2006 | |
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | FI | 22.11.2006 | |
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 22.11.2006 | |
SE | 22.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1909355 (E OSSWALD FA) [A] 1-17 * page 1 - page 4; figure - *; | [A]DE3419250 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-17* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US5269072 (WALIGORSKI GORDON J [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 9, line 64 - column 10, line 11; figures 2,5,7; claim 1 *; | [AD]US5292005 (WIREMAN JACK [US], et al) [AD] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US5564331 (SONG EUGENE [KR]) [A] 1-17 * column 7, line 9 - column 8, line 35; figure 11 *; | [AP]EP1034707 (SONG EUGENE [KR]) [AP] 1-17 * column 2, line 3 - line 24; figure 5 * | by applicant | US4419384 | EP0137556 | US5292005 | EP0756145 | EP0965279 |