EP1120893 - Switching power supply [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.03.2007 [2007/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishida, Akio, (A170) Intell. Property Department Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 26-10,Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | 02 /
Tani, Ryota, (A170) Intellect. Property Department Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 26-10,Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | 03 /
Nakahira, Koji, (A170) Intell. Property Department Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 26-10,Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | 04 /
Yamada, Tomohiro, (A170) Intellect. Property Dept. Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 26-10,Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | [2001/31] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Schoppe, Zimmermann & Stöckeler Patentanwälte Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01100454.6 | 08.01.2001 | [2001/31] | Priority number, date | JP20000002516 | 11.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000002516 | [2001/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1120893 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1120893 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | [2003/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1120893 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1120893 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/338 | [2001/31] | CPC: |
H02M3/3385 (EP,US);
H02M1/0032 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/06] |
Former [2001/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Schaltnetzteil | [2001/31] | English: | Switching power supply | [2001/31] | French: | Alimentation de puissance à découpage | [2001/31] | Examination procedure | 08.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/31] | 05.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 08.01.2006 | [2007/11] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH08266044 ; | [E]JP2001045759 ; | [Y]US5812383 (MAJID NAVEED [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 35; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0938184 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0098]; figure 1 *; | [A]GB2230114 (RCA LICENSING CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 11, line 36 - page 12, line 7; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH08340675 ; | [A]JPH05236743 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08266044 A 19961011 (TEC CORP) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * | [E] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010605), vol. 2000, no. 19, & JP2001045759 A 20010216 (CANON INC) [E] 1,3,5-7,11,12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970430), vol. 1997, no. 04, & JP08340675 A 19961224 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931220), vol. 017, no. 698, Database accession no. (E - 1481), & JP05236743 A 19930910 (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |