EP1118850 - Apparatus for adjusting the cant of an annular article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company 1144 East Market Street Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY 1144 East Market Street Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Somppi, Kerri Arne 213 Lincoln Avenue Cuyahoga Falls, OH 44221 / US | 02 /
Treier, Matthew Alan 687 Morningview Avenue Akron, OH 44305 / US | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | Kutsch, Bernd Goodyear S.A. Patent Department 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | ||
Former [2001/30] | Leitz, Paul Goodyear S.A., Patent-Department, Avenue Gordon Smith 7750 Colmar-Berg / LU | Application number, filing date | 01100506.3 | 09.01.2001 | [2001/30] | Priority number, date | US20000489351 | 21.01.2000 Original published format: US 489351 | [2001/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1118850 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1118850 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01M17/02 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
B62D17/00 (EP,US);
B60G2200/46 (EP,US);
B60G2200/462 (EP,US);
B60G2204/149 (EP,US);
B60G2204/4402 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/21] |
Former [2001/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Einstellung der schrägen Lage eines ringförmigen Körpers | [2001/30] | English: | Apparatus for adjusting the cant of an annular article | [2001/30] | French: | Dispositif de réglage de l'inclinaison d'un article annulaire | [2001/30] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/49] | 30.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.04.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.04.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.04.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 11.04.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.04.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US774042 (COOPER ALBERT N [US]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]USRE36058E (SOKOL GARY L [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 24; figures 4,6 * * column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 16; figure 12; claim 1 *; | [X]WO9425326 (SPECIALTY PRODUCTS INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 2, lines 14-24 * * page 14, line 9 - page 18, line 14; figures 2,7,12 *; | [ED]WO0049381 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US], et al) [ED] 1,2 * abstract * * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 11; figures 1,6,7 * * page 6, lines 25-31 *; | [A]US4867472 (WARD ARLEN T [US]) [A] * column 3, line 38 - column 4, line 27; figures 1,2 * |