EP1117109 - Electrolytic capacitor with low inductance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.02.2006 [2006/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EPCOS AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2003/33] |
Former [2001/29] | For all designated states EPCOS AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81541 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Will, Norbert Normannenweg 16 89522 Heidenheim / DE | 02 /
Hebel, Rainer Stuttgarter Ring 47 89522 Heidenheim / DE | 03 /
Danzer, Klaus Auf der Koppel 19 89188 Merklingen / DE | [2001/29] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | Epping Hermann & Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01100592.3 | 10.01.2001 | [2001/29] | Priority number, date | DE2000101120 | 13.01.2000 Original published format: DE 10001120 | [2001/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1117109 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01G9/008 | [2001/29] | CPC: |
H01G9/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [2002/15] |
Former [2001/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Induktionsarmer Elektrolyt-Kondensator | [2001/29] | English: | Electrolytic capacitor with low inductance | [2001/29] | French: | Condensateur électrolytique à faible inductance | [2001/29] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 19.01.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, TR | 23.12.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.03.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.03.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0026842 (SANGAMO WESTON [US]) [A] 1 * page 5, paragraph 5 - page 7, paragraph 1 ** figure 1 *; | [A]DE3528074 (EMHART IND [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 2 *; | [A]EP0476297 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 1 - line 42 * * figures 1,2 * |