14.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] |
17.11.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2006 [2006/51] |
10.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
18.03.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] |
21.01.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.03.2005 [2005/10] |
03.12.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.01.2005 [2005/03] |
26.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
12.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] |
03.09.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] |
20.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] |
13.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] |
30.01.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.03.2004 [2004/12] |
20.01.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.01.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.01.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.12.2003 |
Change - representative |
published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] |
27.08.2003 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.01.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.07.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
08.03.2002 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 24.04.2002 [2002/17] |
15.02.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.04.2002 [2002/14] |
15.06.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.08.2001 [2001/31] |