EP1120620 - Heat exchange module, more especially for automotive vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR 8, rue Louis-Lormand 78321 La Verrière / FR | [2001/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Avequin, Stéphane 65bis, Avenue de Saint-Cloud 78000 Versailles / FR | 02 /
Gille, Gérard 97, rue Maximilien Robespierre 91550 Paray Vieille Poste / FR | [2001/31] | Representative(s) | Rolland, Jean-Christophe Valeo Systèmes Thermiques 8 Rue Louis Lormand BP 517 - La Verrière 78321 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | Rolland, Jean-Christophe Valeo Thermique Moteur, Propriété Industrielle, 8, rue Louis-Lormand 78321 La Verrière / FR | ||
Former [2001/31] | Lemaire, Marc Valeo Thermique Moteur, 8, rue Louis Lormand 78321 La Verrière / FR | Application number, filing date | 01100874.5 | 16.01.2001 | [2001/31] | Priority number, date | FR20000001137 | 28.01.2000 Original published format: FR 0001137 | FR20000010347 | 04.08.2000 Original published format: FR 0010347 | [2001/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1120620 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1120620 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F28D1/04, F28F9/00, F28F9/013 | [2001/31] | CPC: |
F28F9/0131 (EP,US);
F28D1/0435 (EP,US);
F28F9/002 (EP,US);
F28D2021/0084 (EP,US);
F28D2021/0094 (EP,US);
F28F2275/085 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4935 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/17] |
Former [2001/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Wärmeaustauschmodul, insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeuge | [2001/31] | English: | Heat exchange module, more especially for automotive vehicle | [2001/31] | French: | Module d'échange de chaleur, en particulier pour véhicule automobile | [2001/31] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/14] | 08.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 31.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.03.2004 | FI | 17.03.2004 | GB | 17.03.2004 | IE | 17.03.2004 | NL | 17.03.2004 | TR | 17.03.2004 | DK | 17.06.2004 | GR | 17.06.2004 | SE | 17.06.2004 | ES | 28.06.2004 | PT | 17.08.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2006/51] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
GB | 17.03.2004 | ||
IE | 17.03.2004 | ||
NL | 17.03.2004 | ||
TR | 17.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
ES | 28.06.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
GB | 17.03.2004 | ||
IE | 17.03.2004 | ||
NL | 17.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
ES | 28.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
GB | 17.03.2004 | ||
IE | 17.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
ES | 28.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
GB | 17.03.2004 | ||
IE | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
ES | 28.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
GB | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
ES | 28.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
GB | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
SE | 17.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1521637 (CHAUSSON USINES SA) [A] 1-14 * page 3, column L, line 37 - column R, line 22; figure 4 *; | [A]DE2300080 (BENTELER WERKE AG) [A] 1-14 * page 3, line 4 - page 4, line 15; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US3938587 (VIAN DAVID R) [A] 1-14 * column 3, line 53 - column 8, line 20; figures 1-14 *; | [A]FR2549945 (VALEO [FR]) [A] 1-14 * page 4, line 31 - page 7, line 9; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE19628523 (HERBST DONALD [DE]) [A] 1-14 * column 2, line 17 - column 3, line 5; figure 2 *; | [A]US5725047 (LOPEZ ROBERT R [US]) [A] 1-14* column 2, line 43 - column 4, line 43; figures 1-9 *; | [A]US5743328 (SASAKI HIRONAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 16, line 1 - line 24; figures 44,46 * |