EP1119203 - Image decoding apparatus, semiconductor device, and image decoding method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.07.2010 [2010/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | For all designated states NEC Electronics Corporation 1753 Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | ||
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sagara, Taisuke, Nec Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01100977.6 | 17.01.2001 | [2001/30] | Priority number, date | JP20000013424 | 21.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000013424 | [2001/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1119203 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1119203 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
H04N7/01 (EP,US);
H04N19/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bilddecodiervorrichtung, Halbleitervorrichtung und Bilddecodierverfahren | [2001/30] | English: | Image decoding apparatus, semiconductor device, and image decoding method | [2001/30] | French: | Dispositif de décodage d'images, dispositif semiconducteur et procédé de décodage d'images | [2001/30] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0950944 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0045]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0082] *; | [A]JPH05176305 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]JPH11187396 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |