EP1118849 - High-pressure sensor with one or two threaded stems bearing multi-pad sensor chips [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.08.2003 [2003/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imai, Masahito, c/o Denso Corporation Intellectual Property Dept., 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 01100991.7 | 17.01.2001 | [2001/30] | Priority number, date | JP20000013935 | 18.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000013935 | JP20000013936 | 18.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000013936 | JP20000327503 | 26.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000327503 | JP20000327510 | 26.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000327510 | [2001/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1118849 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1118849 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01L9/00 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
G01L19/0084 (EP);
G01L15/00 (EP);
G01L19/142 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/16] |
Former [2001/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Hochdruckwandler mit ein oder zwei Gewindeschäften mit Vielkontakt Sensor Chips | [2001/30] | English: | High-pressure sensor with one or two threaded stems bearing multi-pad sensor chips | [2001/30] | French: | Capteur à haute pression avec une ou deux tiges filetées avec des chips à contacts multiples | [2001/30] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/33] | 01.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19843471 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 13 *; | [A]US4939497 (NISHIDA MINORU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,6-8 *; | [A]US5119680 (MYHRE KJELL E [US]) [A] 1 * figure 11 *; | [A]WO9801731 (DATA INSTR INC [US]) [A] 3 * claim 1 *; | [DPA]FR2791430 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [DPA] 1 * figures 1,10,14,15 * |