EP1118537 - Galley unit for aircraft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAMCO CORPORATION 6-11-25 Osawa Mitaka Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states JAMCO CORPORATION 6-11-25 Osawa Mitaka, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kasuya, Toshihisa, c/o Jamco Corporation 6-11-25, Osawa, Mitaka Tokyo / JP | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 01101090.7 | 18.01.2001 | [2001/30] | Priority number, date | JP20000011917 | 20.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000011917 | [2001/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1118537 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1118537 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | [2002/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B64D11/04 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
B64D11/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2003/26] |
Former [2001/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Flugzeug-Bordküche | [2001/30] | English: | Galley unit for aircraft | [2001/30] | French: | Cuisine de bord d'aéronef | [2001/30] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/07] | 19.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 03.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/06] | 07.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.05.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2851709 (JASBEC KURT DIPL ING) [A] 1 * page 10, paragraph 2 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0074092 (NORDSKOG ROBERT A) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [A] - AIRCRAFT ENGINERING, London, (198709), vol. 59, no. 9, page 6-8, XP002203928 [A] 1-5 * page 6, column L * * figure - * |