EP1122528 - Arrangement and method for determining dilatations and temperature and variations thereof of a covering layer applied on a support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/32] | Arrangement and method for determining dilatations and temperature as well variations thereof of a covering layer applied on a support | ||
[2009/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Deutschland GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2010/03] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states Airbus Deutschland GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states EADS Airbus GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gleine, Wolfgang, Dr.-Ing. Rademacher Kamp 1 21255 Kakenstorf / DE | 02 /
Trutzel, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Burgsteige 18 89134 Blaustein/Ulm / DE | [2001/32] | Representative(s) | Hansmann, Dierk Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/32] | Hansmann, Dierk, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01101332.3 | 22.01.2001 | [2001/32] | Priority number, date | DE2000104384 | 02.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10004384 | [2001/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1122528 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1122528 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | [2003/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1122528 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01L1/24 | [2001/32] | CPC: |
G01M11/086 (EP,US);
G01K11/3206 (EP,US);
G01L5/0047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/32] | Title | German: | Anordnung und Verfahren zur Erfassung von Dehnungen und Temperaturen und deren Veränderungen einer auf einem Träger applizierten Deckschicht | [2001/32] | English: | Arrangement and method for determining dilatations and temperature and variations thereof of a covering layer applied on a support | [2009/38] | French: | Arrangement et méthode pour déterminer dilatations et températures et ses variations d'une couche de couverture appliquée sur un support | [2001/32] |
Former [2001/32] | Arrangement and method for determining dilatations and temperature as well variations thereof of a covering layer applied on a support | Examination procedure | 23.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 25.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.01.2010 | DK | 20.01.2010 | FI | 20.01.2010 | IE | 20.01.2010 | NL | 20.01.2010 | SE | 20.01.2010 | TR | 20.01.2010 | AT | 22.01.2010 | LU | 22.01.2010 | BE | 31.01.2010 | CH | 31.01.2010 | LI | 31.01.2010 | MC | 31.01.2010 | GR | 21.04.2010 | ES | 01.05.2010 | PT | 20.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
AT | 22.01.2010 | ||
LU | 22.01.2010 | ||
BE | 31.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
AT | 22.01.2010 | ||
BE | 31.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
BE | 31.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | FI | 20.01.2010 | |
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | FI | 20.01.2010 | |
NL | 20.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | NL | 20.01.2010 | |
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | NL | 20.01.2010 | |
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | ES | 01.05.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE3142392 (VER FLUGTECHNISCHE WERKE [DE]) [YD] 1 * page 5 - page 6 *; | [A]US5345519 (LU ZHUO J [CA]) [A] 1 * claims 1-10 *; | [AD]WO9524614 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US], et al) [AD] 1 * page 2 - page 3 *; | [A]WO9726572 (CORNING INC [US], et al) [A] 1* claims 23-40 *; | [A]US5680489 (KERSEY ALAN D [US]) [A] 1 * claims 1-17 *; | [A]WO9827446 (MICRON OPTICS INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 6 - page 8 *; | [A]WO9950699 (CORNING INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 7 - page 10 *; | [A]WO9961875 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1 * page 5 - page 11 *; | [Y]US6018160 (BENNION IAN [GB], et al) [Y] 1 * claims 1-8 *; | [AP]EP1014123 (OTC OPTICAL TECHNOLOGIES CENTE [IT]) [AP] 1 * claims 1-4 * |