EP1120380 - Reactor for water softening and/or treatment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2006 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Althöfer, Philipp, Dipl.-Geogr. Venloer Strasse 717 50827 Köln / DE | [2001/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/31] | Representative(s) | Stute, Ivo Peter, et al Patentanwalt Postfach 200 221 40100 Düsseldorf / DE | [2008/37] |
Former [2002/14] | Stute, Ivo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Alt-Niederkassel 75 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2001/31] | Stute, Ivo, Dipl.-Ing. Partnerschaft Dunkelberg & Stute Patentanwälte Friesenwall 5-7 50672 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 01101335.6 | 21.01.2001 | [2001/31] | Priority number, date | DE2000102660 | 21.01.2000 Original published format: DE 10002660 | [2001/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1120380 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1120380 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | [2001/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1120380 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/12, B01D21/00, B01D21/08, B01D21/24, C02F5/02 | [2001/31] | CPC: |
C02F5/02 (EP);
B01D21/2494 (EP);
B03D1/082 (EP);
B03D1/1468 (EP);
B03D1/26 (EP);
C02F1/006 (EP);
C02F1/5281 (EP);
C02F3/20 (EP);
C02F3/223 (EP);
B01D21/2405 (EP);
B01D21/2433 (EP);
B01D21/2444 (EP);
B01D21/245 (EP);
B01D21/2488 (EP);
B03D1/1412 (EP);
Y02W10/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/23] |
Former [2001/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Reaktor zum Enthärten und/oder Aufbereiten von Wasser | [2001/31] | English: | Reactor for water softening and/or treatment | [2001/31] | French: | Réacteur pour l'adoucissement et/ou le traitement de l'eau | [2001/31] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/31] | 19.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 10.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 19.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/33] | Request for further processing for: | 19.04.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 19.04.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.08.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.09.2005 | IE | 07.09.2005 | TR | 07.09.2005 | DK | 07.12.2005 | GR | 07.12.2005 | LU | 31.01.2006 | MC | 31.01.2006 | PT | 07.02.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | IE | 07.09.2005 | |
TR | 07.09.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | IE | 07.09.2005 | |
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
LU | 31.01.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | IE | 07.09.2005 | |
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2006 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | IE | 07.09.2005 | |
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | DK | 07.12.2005 | |
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | GR | 07.12.2005 | |
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/15] | GR | 07.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS574296 ; | [X]WO9630308 (EDWARDS LAB INC [US]) [X] 1-6,8,10,11,13-15,17 * page 1, lines 12-19; figure - *; | [PA]DE19918695 (JULIUS SCHULTE SOEHNE GMBH & C [DE]) [PA] 1-6,8,10-19* the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820422), vol. 006, no. 063, Database accession no. (C - 099), & JP57004296 A 19820109 (DOWA MINING CO LTD) [X] 1-6,15 * abstract * |