EP1143025 - Piston ring and manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2007 [2007/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Federal-Mogul Burscheid GmbH Bürgermeister-Schmidt-Strasse 17 51399 Burscheid / DE | [2001/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grunow, Frank, Dr. Am Eulenflug 4 51399 Burscheid / DE | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01101444.6 | 23.01.2001 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | DE20001012619 | 15.03.2000 Original published format: DE 10012619 | [2001/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1143025 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/22, C22C38/24, C22C38/06, C23C8/26, C23C8/36, F16J9/26 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
C22C38/24 (EP);
B23P15/065 (EP);
C22C38/06 (EP);
C22C38/22 (EP);
C23C8/26 (EP);
C23C8/38 (EP);
F16J9/26 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, PT [2002/27] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Stahlkolbenring sowie Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [2001/41] | English: | Piston ring and manufacturing method | [2001/41] | French: | Segment de piston et méthode de fabrication | [2001/41] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2001 | Examination requested [2002/01] | 11.04.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.07.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, SE, TR | 01.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/04] | 06.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.05.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.05.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH1180907 ; | [DXA]DE3431244 (NIPPON PISTON RING CO LTD [JP]) [DX] 1,4-6 * claims 1-8 * * table 1 * [A] 2,3; | [XA]JPH10121195 ; | [XA]JPH08193242 ; | [XA]JPH07188852 ; | [XA]JPH08176732 ; | [X]JPH08209300 ; | [A]US5304262 (KARAOKE TAKAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-13 * * examples 1-3 *; | [A]EP0594042 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-7 * * examples 1-4 * * column 10, line 15 - column 15, line 25 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11080907 A 19990326 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [X] 1,3,4,15 * abstract * [A] 2,5-14 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10121195 A 19980512 (SANYO SPECIAL STEEL CO LTD) [X] 1,3-6 * abstract * [A] 2,7-15 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 1996, no. 11, & JP08193242 A 19960730 (SUMITOMO METAL IND LTD) [X] 1-5 * abstract * [A] 6-15 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 1995, no. 10, & JP07188852 A 19950725 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract * [A] 2,5-15 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 1996, no. 11, & JP08176732 A 19960709 (NKK CORP;NIPPON TECHNO:KK; NAGAOKA DENSHI KK) [X] 1,4 * abstract * [A] 2,3,5-15 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 1996, no. 12, & JP08209300 A 19960813 (SUMITOMO METAL IND LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract * | by applicant | DE3431244 |