EP1120429 - Process for producing natural rubber for pressure-sensitive adhesive and natural rubber-based pressure-sensitive adhesive composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Banba, Tomohide, c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Minamizaki, Yoshihiro, c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Hirose, Isao, c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | 04 /
Umehara, Toshiyuki, c/o Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka / JP | [2001/31] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01101455.2 | 23.01.2001 | [2001/31] | Priority number, date | JP20000015118 | 24.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000015118 | [2001/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1120429 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08C19/08, C09J107/00 | [2001/31] | CPC: |
C08C19/08 (EP,US);
C08C19/00 (KR);
C09J107/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/17] |
Former [2001/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von Naturkautschuk für druckempfindliche Klebmittel und druckempfindliche Klebmittelzusammensetzung auf Basis von Naturkautschuk | [2001/31] | English: | Process for producing natural rubber for pressure-sensitive adhesive and natural rubber-based pressure-sensitive adhesive composition | [2001/31] | French: | Procédé de production de caoutchouc naturel pour adhésif sensible à la pression et composition d'adhésif sensible à la pression à base de caoutchouc naturel | [2001/31] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/02] | 02.02.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 27.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/24] | 22.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.03.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.03.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB700461 (DUNLOP RUBBER CO) [X] 1-4 * examples 1,6,8; claim - * * page 1, line 58 - page 2, line 28 *; | [Y]US3925271 (BALINTH IVAN J) [Y] 6* abstract *; | [XY]EP0702029 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * page 2, line 5 - line 12 * [Y] 6 |