EP1123877 - Method for handling flexible containers (FIBC) as well as container for carrying out the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.12.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boxon GmbH Wilhelm-Hörmes-Strasse 52 47877 Willich / DE | [2002/13] |
Former [2001/33] | For all designated states EWP Industrieembellagen GmbH Wilhelm-Hörmes-Strasse 52 47877 Willich / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Körting, Herrmann Neuringe 35 49767 Twist / DE | [2001/33] | Representative(s) | Paul, Dieter-Alfred, et al Paul & Albrecht Patentanwälte PartG mbB Stresemannallee 4b 41460 Neuss / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/33] | Paul, Dieter-Alfred, Dipl.-Ing., et al Paul & Albrecht Patentanwaltssozietät Hellersbergstrasse 18 41460 Neuss / DE | Application number, filing date | 01101487.5 | 24.01.2001 | [2001/33] | Priority number, date | DE2000202469U | 11.02.2000 Original published format: DE 20002469 U | [2001/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1123877 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1123877 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | [2002/23] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1123877 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65D88/16, B65B69/00 | [2002/23] | CPC: |
B65D88/1668 (EP);
B65D88/1681 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/33] | B65D88/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Handhaben von als flexible IBC ausgebildeten Behältern sowie Behälter zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens | [2002/34] | English: | Method for handling flexible containers (FIBC) as well as container for carrying out the method | [2001/33] | French: | Méthode pour la manipulation de recipients deformables (FIBC) et conteneur pour la mise en oeuvre d'une telle méthode | [2001/33] |
Former [2001/33] | Verfahren zum Handbaren von als flexible IBC ausgebildeten Behältern sowie Behälter zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens | Examination procedure | 03.12.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1486301 (DUNLOP AG) [A] 1* figure - *; | [A]WO9312016 (HABERL GMBH [AT]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 12 - line 15; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE4400991 | DE29818151U |