EP1122754 - Operating element for electrical or electronic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.12.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2007 [2007/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB PATENT GmbH Wallstadter Strasse 59 68526 Ladenburg / DE | [2001/42] |
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states ABB PATENT GmbH Kallstadter Strasse 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vogt, Friedrich Im Dahl 45 58579 Schalksmühle / DE | 02 /
Zapp, Robert Löher Weg 35 58579 Schalksmühle / DE | 03 /
Neumann, Wolfgang Mozartstrasse 4 58849 Herscheid / DE | 04 /
Schmidt, Karsten Oberönkfeld 2 42477 Radevormwald / DE | 05 /
Rosch, Rainer, Dr. Kerkhagen 22 58513 Lüdenscheid / DE | [2001/32] | Representative(s) | Miller, Toivo, et al ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 1140 68520 Ladenburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/32] | Miller, Toivo, et al ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 01101757.1 | 18.01.2001 | [2001/32] | Priority number, date | DE2000105027 | 04.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10005027 | [2001/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1122754 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1122754 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01H23/00, H01H11/00, H01H1/40, H01H23/08 | [2001/32] | CPC: |
H01H23/08 (EP);
H01H1/403 (EP);
H01H2011/0081 (EP);
H01H2011/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, SE [2004/01] |
Former [2001/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Bedienelement eines elektrischen/elektronischen Installationsgerätes | [2001/32] | English: | Operating element for electrical or electronic apparatus | [2001/32] | French: | Elément de commande pour appareil électrique ou électronique | [2001/32] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/29] | 03.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/04] | 12.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4332991 (NORDSTROM ARNOLD B); | [A]US4733024 (TAKESHIMA MASAJI [JP], et al); | [A]DE19737134 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5935691 (TSAI JASON [TW]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE29905710U (PETRI AG [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1,2 * |