EP1122511 - Displacement sensor having a display data output [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | ||
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudoudou-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokouji-doori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu, 600-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsunaga, Tatsuya c/o Omron Corpporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 02 /
Kawachi, Masahiro c/o Omron Corpporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2009/08] |
Former [2001/32] | 01 /
Matsunaga, Tatsuya, Omron Corp.Minamifudoudou-cho Horikawahigshiiru, Shiokouji-dori Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu 600-8530 / JP | ||
02 /
Kawachi, Masahiro, Omron Corp.Minamifudoudou-cho Horikawahigshiiru, Shiokouji-dori Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu 600-8530 / JP | Representative(s) | Kilian, Helmut Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/32] | Kilian, Helmut, Dr. Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01101806.6 | 26.01.2001 | [2001/32] | Priority number, date | JP20000027429 | 31.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000027429 | JP20000382665 | 15.12.2000 Original published format: JP 2000382665 | [2001/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1122511 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1122511 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | [2006/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1122511 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/00, G01B11/06, G01B11/02 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
G01B11/024 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/32] | G01B11/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/29] |
Former [2001/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Positionsmesssensor mit Datensichtgerät | [2001/32] | English: | Displacement sensor having a display data output | [2001/32] | French: | Capteur de déplacement avec unité d'affichage | [2001/32] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/23] | 19.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0277502 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [A] 1-6 * figures 3,37 * * column 3, line 46 - line 11 * * column 11, line 15 - line 28 * * column 11, line 46 - line 13 *; | [A]EP0462289 (TOYODA CHUO KENKYUSHO KK [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 1,6,7 * * page 12, line 6 - line 15 * * page 3, line 46 - page 4, line 12 * * claim 1 *; | [XA]US5129010 (HIGUCHI KAZUNORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 1,5,18,19 * * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 2 * * column 14, line 21 - column 15, line 18 * * claim 1 * [A] 4,9,15; | [X]EP0532257 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3 * figures 1,3 * * column 2, line 27 - line 34 * * column 3, line 8 - line 37 * * column 4, line 15 - line 22 * * column 6, line 1 - line 45 * * column 8, line 26 - line 49 *; | [A]WO9416290 (THERMO ELECTRON WEB SYST INC [US]) [A] 1-3 * figure 1 * * page 2, line 21 - page 4, line 4 * * page 7, line 10 - line 22 *; | [A]EP0841558 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 4, line 20 - line 58; figures 1,2,10 * * column 5, line 25 - line 52 * * column 10, line 11 - line 24 * * column 19, line 10 - line 40 ** figures 1,2,9,10 * |