EP1120365 - Chain links with antifriction elements for conveyor belt with cross bars and side chains for medium-light material handling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graziani, Mario Via Tartini 16 36060 Romano d'Ezzelino (VI) / IT | [2001/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/31] | Representative(s) | Gustorf, Gerhard Bachstrasse 6a 84036 Landshut / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | Gustorf, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Bachstrasse 6 A 84036 Landshut / DE | Application number, filing date | 01101849.6 | 26.01.2001 | [2001/31] | Priority number, date | IT2000PD00021 | 28.01.2000 Original published format: IT PD000021 | [2001/31] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1120365 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65G17/06, B65G21/22, B65G17/30, B65G17/48, B65G19/18 | [2001/31] | CPC: |
B65G17/063 (EP);
B65G17/30 (EP);
B65G17/48 (EP);
B65G19/18 (EP);
B65G21/22 (EP);
B65G2201/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/17] |
Former [2001/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kettenglieder mit reibungsarme Führungselemente für Förderbande mit traversen, Seitenketten für den Transport von mittelleichten Produkten | [2001/31] | English: | Chain links with antifriction elements for conveyor belt with cross bars and side chains for medium-light material handling | [2001/31] | French: | Maillons de chaîne avec des éléments antifriction pour convoyeur à bande avec des barres et chaînes latérales pour transporter un produit d'un poids moyen-léger | [2001/31] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/15] | 01.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/06] | 04.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PXD]EP0995699 (GRAZIANI STEFANO [IT]) [PXD] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US5350056 (HAGER MICHAEL L [US]) [A] 1,5,6 * column 6, line 37 - line 48; figure 5C *; | [A]US3938651 (ALFRED P ALLAN, et al) [A] 1-3 * figures 3-5C *; | [A]US5398521 (BARON DAVID L [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * figures 9A,9B *; | [A]EP0293095 (FRIGOSCANDIA FOOD PROCESS SYSTEMS) [A] 1 * figure 8 *; | [A]EP0544085 (TECNO POOL SPA [IT]); | [A]EP0693444 (TECNO POOL SPA [IT]) | by applicant | IT1998PD00236 |