EP1127748 - Device and method for voice control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/18] |
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kynast, Andreas Trockener Kamp 27 31139 Hildesheim / DE | [2001/35] | Application number, filing date | 01102015.3 | 30.01.2001 | [2001/35] | Priority number, date | DE2000108226 | 22.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10008226 | [2001/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1127748 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1127748 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | [2004/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1127748 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/02 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
B60R16/0373 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/50] |
Former [2001/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Sprachsteuerung | [2001/35] | English: | Device and method for voice control | [2001/35] | French: | Dispositif et méthode de la commande par voix | [2001/35] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/47] | 22.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH09102098 ; | [Y]DE3712170 (HOLTRONIC GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 6 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5276471 (YAMAUCHI TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5621424 (SHIMADA NAOTO [JP], et al) [Y] 5* the whole document *; | [XY]EP0893308 (EQUOS RESEARCH KK [JP]) [X] 1-4,7-14 * column 1, line 29 - column 3, line 12 * * column 5, line 6 - column 11, line 42 * * column 13, line 39 - column 15, line 38 * * column 16, line 13 - column 20, line 24 * * column 22, line 51 - column 23, line 31 * * column 43, line 27 - column 45, line 44; figures 1-50 * [Y] 5,6; | [Y]US5883739 (ASHIHARA JUN [JP], et al) [Y] 6 * the whole document * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 1997, no. 08, & JP09102098 A 19970415 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,7 * abstract * [Y] 5,6 |