Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50109658D1 | 08.06.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE10008226 | 22.02.2000 | DE50109658 | 30.01.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001255890 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | DE10008226 | 22.02.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1127748 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2006 | B1 | EP1127748 | 17.03.2004 | A3 | EP1127748 | 29.08.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE10008226 | 22.02.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10008226 | 13.06.2002 | C2 | DE10008226 | 06.09.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10008226 | 22.02.2000 |