EP1134752 - Magnetic powder, magnetic ink, printed member and manufacturing method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/38] | Magnetic validity determining ink, manufacturing method and uses | ||
[2004/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72 Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72 Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sawa, Takao c/o Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Prop. Div. 1-1-1 Shibaura Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Nakagawa, Katsutoshi c/o Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Prop. Div. 1-1-1 Shibaura Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Murakami, Teruo c/o Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Prop. Div. 1-1-1 Shibaura Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kobayashi, Tadahiko c/o Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Prop. Div. 1-1-1 Shibaura Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Takahashi, Hisashi c/o Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Prop. Div. 1-1-1 Shibaura Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Obama, Masao c/o Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Prop. Div. 1-1-1 Shibaura Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/26] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Patenta Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/38] | Blumbach, Kramer & Partner GbR Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01102261.3 | 31.01.2001 | [2001/38] | Priority number, date | JP20000075850 | 17.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000075850 | [2001/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1134752 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1134752 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | [2002/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1134752 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01F1/44, H01F1/38, G08B13/24, H01F1/00, H01F41/16, H01F1/34, H01F1/36, H01F1/11, G06K19/12, G06K7/08 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
B42D25/378 (EP,US);
B42D25/369 (EP,US);
G08B13/2408 (EP,US);
G08B13/244 (EP,US);
G08B13/2442 (EP,US);
G08B13/2445 (EP,US);
G08B13/2471 (EP,US);
H01F1/37 (EP,US);
H01F1/38 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/25] | H01F1/44, H01F1/38, G08B13/24, H01F1/00, H01F41/16, H01F1/34, H01F1/36, H01F1/11 | ||
Former IPC [2001/38] | H01F1/44, H01F1/38, G08B13/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/33] |
Former [2001/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Magnetpulver, magnetische Tinte, bedrucktes Element und Verfahren zu desser Herstellung | [2004/51] | English: | Magnetic powder, magnetic ink, printed member and manufacturing method therefor | [2004/51] | French: | Poudre magnétique, encre magnétique, élement imprimé et son procédé de fabrication | [2004/51] |
Former [2001/38] | Magnetische Markertinte, Herstellungsverfahren und Benutzung | ||
Former [2001/38] | Magnetic validity determining ink, manufacturing method and uses | ||
Former [2001/38] | Encre magnétique pour étiquette, procédé de fabrication et utilisations | Examination procedure | 31.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/38] | 21.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03020771.6 / EP1372163 | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS60210801 ; | [XYA]US4081132 (PEARCE RALPH REGINALD) [X] 8,12 * claims 1,5,7,8,10 * * column 3, line 31 - line 45 * [Y] 13,15 [A] 10; | [Y]EP0291306 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [Y] 13,15 * claims 1,3,6,7,12,14,17,19,20 * * column 2, line 12 - line 15 ** column 4, line 16 - line 23 *; | [YA]DE4103263 (BASF MAGNETICS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-3,5 * claim 1 * * column 2, line 9 - line 24 * [A] 6,7; | [DY]EP0702339 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [DY] 1-3,5 * claims 1,2 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1985, no. 49, Database accession no. 1985-305996, XP002197167 & JPS60210801 A 19851023 (HITACHI METALS LTD) [X] 4 * abstract * | by applicant | US5533759 |