EP1229710 - Home installation apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider + Fichtel GmbH Etzwiesenstrasse 33 72108 Rottenburg a.N. / DE | [2002/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneider, Rolf A.O. Im Lichtle 8 72108 Rottenburg / DE | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2003/31] |
Former [2003/20] | Beier, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing, et al Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2002/32] | Dallmeyer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 01102497.3 | 05.02.2001 | [2002/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1229710 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/02 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
H04M11/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/18] |
Former [2002/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Hausinstallationseinrichtung | [2002/32] | English: | Home installation apparatus | [2002/32] | French: | Dispositif d'installation domotique | [2002/32] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/06] | 03.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.06.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.06.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3832616 (ELECTRONIC WERKE DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [Y] 22,23* abstract *; | [Y]DE19637731 (ME FA DAN TRADING A S VIBY SJ [DK], et al) [Y] 11,12,16 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE19851425 (KREMSER PETER FA [DE]) [Y] 13-15 * column 2, line 15 - line 25 *; | [Y]DE19938064 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 17-19 * abstract *; | [XAY]DE29913108U (MERTEN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,8-10,20,21 * page 2, line 1 - line 22 * * page 3, line 13 - line 15 * * page 4, line 23 - page 5, line 25 * * page 6, line 1 - line 8 * [A] 3,4,6,7 [Y] 11-19,22,23 |