EP1128476 - Method of manufacturing a connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/35] | Connector and method of manufacturing a connector | ||
[2015/28] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2015 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harting Electronics GmbH & Co. KG Marienwerderstrasse 3 32339 Espelkamp / DE | [2009/14] |
Former [2004/02] | For all designated states Harting Electronics GmbH & Co. KG Marienwerderstrasse 3 32339 Espelkamp / DE | ||
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states HARTING KGaA Marienwerderstrasse 3 32339 Espelkamp / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pape, Günter, Dipl.-Ing. Sundernstrasse 75a 32130 Enger / DE | 02 /
Lüttermann, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Möllers Garten 8 32369 Rahden / DE | [2009/09] |
Former [2001/35] | 01 /
Pape, Günter, Dipl.-Ing. Sundernstrasse 75a 32130 Enger / DE | ||
02 /
Lüttermann, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Von-Vincke-Strasse 16 32312 Lübbecke / DE | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [2015/40] |
Former [2010/32] | Prinz & Partner Patentanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01102541.8 | 06.02.2001 | [2001/35] | Priority number, date | DE20001009215 | 26.02.2000 Original published format: DE 10009215 | [2001/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1128476 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1128476 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | [2002/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1128476 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/14] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1128476 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01R43/20 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
H01R43/205 (EP,US);
H01R12/716 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/35] | H01R12/22, H01R43/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2015/40] |
Former [2003/26] | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE | ||
Former [2001/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Steckverbinders | [2015/28] | English: | Method of manufacturing a connector | [2015/28] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un connecteur | [2015/28] |
Former [2001/35] | Steckverbinder sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Steckverbinders | ||
Former [2001/35] | Connector and method of manufacturing a connector | ||
Former [2001/35] | Connecteur et procédé de fabrication d'un connecteur | Examination procedure | 25.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/04] | 03.04.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.08.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) ES | 06.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.12.2009
ADMISSIBLE FCI 145/147 rue Yves Le Coz 78035 Versailles / FR Opponent's representative Heselberger, Johannes, et al, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.12.2009
ADMISSIBLE FCI SA 145/147 rue Yves Le Coz 78035 Versailles / FR Opponent's representative Heselberger, Johannes, et al, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | 09.02.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.06.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.10.2011 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.10.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.11.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.11.2011 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 17.08.2015 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 30.01.2012 | Appeal received No. T0567/12 | 05.04.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.04.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.05.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0471219 (AMP INC [US]) [A] 1,2* the whole document *; | [XDY]WO9530257 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [XD] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2; | [XDY]US5535513 (FRANTZ ROBERT H [US]) [XD] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2; | [A]US5904581 (POPE RICHARD A [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * |