Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.2005 [2005/47] |
15.10.2004 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.12.2004 [2004/49] |
16.04.2004 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
16.04.2004 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
09.03.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
06.12.2003 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
20.11.2003 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
07.10.2003 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
18.06.2003 | Change - extension states | |
28.03.2003 | Examination report or reply | |
04.03.2003 | Renewal fee | |
21.02.2003 | Definitive list of designations | published on 09.04.2003 [2003/15] |
29.11.2002 | First examination report | |
27.11.2002 | Examination report or reply | |
13.07.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.08.2002 [2002/35] |
31.05.2002 | Publication of search report | published on 17.07.2002 [2002/29] |
13.07.2001 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.08.2001 [2001/35] |