Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1146019 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2007 | B1 | EP1146019 | 17.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10006305 | 12.02.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE350353T | 15.01.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE10006305 | 12.02.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE10006305 | 01.08.2002 | C2 | DE10006305 | 23.08.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10006305 | 12.02.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1043102 | 06.09.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE10006305 | 12.02.2000 |