Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1142848
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
10.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
15.04.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] |
23.04.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] |
16.04.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
16.04.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.03.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.12.2003 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.11.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.09.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.05.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
01.04.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
27.03.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
01.03.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.02.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.02.2003 |
Change - representative |
published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] |
06.12.2002 |
Change - representative |
published on 22.01.2003 [2003/04] |
15.11.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
15.11.2002 |
First examination report |
|
13.11.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.09.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
17.05.2002 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] |
12.10.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.11.2001 [2001/48] |
24.08.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.10.2001 [2001/41] |