EP1142848 - Calcium silicate board and method of manufacturing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nichias Co., Ltd. 1-26, Shibadaimon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Nichias Co., Ltd. 1-26, Shibadaimon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakagawa, Shigeru Hamamatsu Research Inst., 8-1 Shinmiyakoda 1-chome Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Naruse, Seiichi Hamamatsu Research Inst., 8-1 Shinmiyakoda 1-chome Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 03 /
Kanou, Takamaro Hamamatsu Research Inst., 8-1 Shinmiyakoda 1-chome Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka / JP | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Müller-Wolff, Thomas, et al Patentanwalt Postfach 19 02 17 53037 Bonn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | Müller-Wolff, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt, Postfach 19 02 17 53037 Bonn / DE | ||
Former [2003/04] | Müller-Wolff, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Postfach 13 54 53703 Siegburg / DE | ||
Former [2001/41] | Müller-Wolff, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing., et al HARWARDT NEUMANN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Brandstrasse 10 53721 Siegburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01102933.7 | 08.02.2001 | [2001/41] | Priority number, date | JP20000036466 | 15.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000036466 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1142848 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1142848 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/18, C04B14/26, // (C04B28/18, 14:26, 18:24, 22:14), C04B111:28 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
C04B28/18 (EP);
C04B14/26 (EP);
C04B2111/28 (EP);
C04B2111/285 (EP);
Y02W30/91 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/18, C04B11/05, C04B14/043, C04B14/26, C04B18/241, C04B20/008, C04B40/024 (EP);
C04B28/18, C04B11/05, C04B14/26, C04B20/0048, C04B20/008 (EP);
C04B28/18, C04B14/043, C04B14/26, C04B18/241, C04B20/008, C04B22/143, C04B40/024 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2002/27] |
Former [2001/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kalziumsilikatplatte und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [2001/41] | English: | Calcium silicate board and method of manufacturing same | [2001/41] | French: | Panneau à base de silicate de calcium et son procédé de fabrication | [2001/41] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/48] | 20.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 08.02.2005 | [2006/13] | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]JPH06305807 ; | [A]US3001882 (TAYLOR WILLIAM C) [A] 1,4 * claim 10 *; | JPS5884153 [ ] (KUBOTA LTD); | [A]EP0207920 (CHANTIER BERTRAND SPRL [BE]); | [A]DE3633471 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO [JP]) [A] 1-3,6 * page 2, lines 59,60; claims 1,2 *; | [Y]WO9200927 (HARDIE & CO PTY LTD J [AU]) [Y] 1-3,5-7 * page 5, line 9 - page 6, line 11; claim 1 *; | [YD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950331), vol. 1995, no. 02, & JP06305807 A 19941101 (NICHIAS CORP) [YD] 1-3,5-7 * abstract * | [A] - KUBOTA LTD., CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19831031), vol. 99, no. 18, Database accession no. 145114u, page 313, XP000188608 [A] 1,5 * abstract * |